OR HB2138 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Failed on June 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-30 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Failed on June 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-30 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Extends sunset for tax credit for provision of volunteer emergency medical services in rural area.
Title
Relating to tax credits for provision of volunteer emergency medical services in a rural area.
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
Roll Calls
2019-05-09 - House - House Committee Do pass. Refer to Tax Expenditures (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-03-26 - House - House Committee Do pass and be referred to Revenue by prior reference (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-26 - House - House Committee Do pass and be referred to Revenue by prior reference (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-30 | House | In committee upon adjournment. |
2019-05-13 | House | Referred to Tax Expenditures by order of Speaker. |
2019-05-13 | House | Recommendation: Do pass and be referred to Tax Expenditures. |
2019-05-09 | House | Work Session held. |
2019-05-06 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2019-04-02 | House | Referred to Revenue by prior reference. |
2019-04-02 | House | Recommendation: Do pass and be referred to Revenue by prior reference. |
2019-03-26 | House | Work Session held. |
2019-03-12 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2019-01-15 | House | Referred to Veterans and Emergency Preparedness with subsequent referral to Revenue. |
2019-01-14 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |