OR HB2137 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on September 25 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-09-25 - Chapter 12, (2021 Laws): Effective date May 06, 2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Modifies, adds and repeals laws related to transportation. Modifies, adds and repeals laws related to transportation. Declares emergency, effective on passage.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to transportation; and declaring an emergency.

Sponsors

No sponsor information available at this time.

Roll Calls

2021-04-26 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 23 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-04-08 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 49 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2021-03-11 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-09-25HouseChapter 12, (2021 Laws): Effective date May 06, 2021.
2021-05-06HouseGovernor signed.
2021-04-28SenatePresident signed.
2021-04-27HouseSpeaker signed.
2021-04-26SenateThird reading. Carried by Findley. Passed. Ayes, 23; Nays, 4--Anderson, Girod, Linthicum, Thomsen; Excused, 3--Heard, Patterson, Thatcher.
2021-04-22SenateSecond reading.
2021-04-22SenateRecommendation: Do pass the A-Eng. bill.
2021-04-15SenateReferred to Transportation.
2021-04-12SenateFirst reading. Referred to President's desk.
2021-04-08HouseThird reading. Carried by McLain. Passed. Ayes, 49; Nays, 4--Bonham, Nearman, Post, Reschke; Excused, 7--Alonso Leon, Bynum, Clem, Leif, Smith G, Speaker Kotek, Wallan.
2021-04-07HouseRules suspended. Carried over to April 8, 2021 Calendar.
2021-04-06HouseCarried over to April 7, 2021 Calendar by virtue of adjournment.
2021-04-05HouseRules suspended. Carried over to April 6, 2021 Calendar.
2021-04-01HouseRules suspended. Carried over to April 5, 2021 Calendar.
2021-03-31HouseCarried over to April 1, 2021 Calendar by virtue of adjournment.
2021-03-30HouseCarried over to March 31, 2021 Calendar by virtue of adjournment.
2021-03-29HouseCarried over to March 30, 2021 Calendar by virtue of adjournment.
2021-03-24HouseCarried over to March 29, 2021 Calendar by virtue of adjournment.
2021-03-22HouseSecond reading.
2021-03-15HouseRecommendation: Do pass with amendments and be printed A-Engrossed.
2021-03-11HouseWork Session held.
2021-02-23HousePublic Hearing held.
2021-02-16HousePublic Hearing cancelled.
2021-01-19HouseReferred to Transportation.
2021-01-11HouseFirst reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.

Oregon State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback