OR HB2135 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Enrolled on June 8 2021 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-06-09 - Motion to concur in Senate amendments and repass bill failed. Ayes, 0; Nays, 58--Alonso Leon, Bonham, Boshart Davis, Breese-Iverson, Bynum, Campos, Cate, Clem, Dexter, Drazan, Fahey, Gomberg, Grayber, Hayden, Helm, Holvey, Hudson, Kropf, Leif, Levy, Lewis, Lively, Marsh, McLain, Meek, Moore-Green, Morgan, Nathanson, Neron, Noble, Nosse, Owens, Pham, Post, Power, Prusak, Rayfield, Reardon, Reschke, Reynolds, Ruiz, Salinas, Sanchez, Schouten, Smith DB, Smith G, Smith Warner, Sollman, Speaker Kotek, Stark, Valderrama, Wallan, Weber, Wilde, Williams, Witt, Wright, Zika; Excused, 1--Evans.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Enrolled on June 8 2021 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-06-09 - Motion to concur in Senate amendments and repass bill failed. Ayes, 0; Nays, 58--Alonso Leon, Bonham, Boshart Davis, Breese-Iverson, Bynum, Campos, Cate, Clem, Dexter, Drazan, Fahey, Gomberg, Grayber, Hayden, Helm, Holvey, Hudson, Kropf, Leif, Levy, Lewis, Lively, Marsh, McLain, Meek, Moore-Green, Morgan, Nathanson, Neron, Noble, Nosse, Owens, Pham, Post, Power, Prusak, Rayfield, Reardon, Reschke, Reynolds, Ruiz, Salinas, Sanchez, Schouten, Smith DB, Smith G, Smith Warner, Sollman, Speaker Kotek, Stark, Valderrama, Wallan, Weber, Wilde, Williams, Witt, Wright, Zika; Excused, 1--Evans.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Prohibits Teacher Standards and Practices Commission from issuing license or registration to person convicted of crime related to domestic violence. Prohibits Teacher Standards and Practices Commission from issuing license or registration to person convicted of crime constituting] related to domestic violence. Allows commission, based on consideration of factors prescribed by commission, to issue license or registration to person convicted of crime related to domestic violence if three or more years have elapsed since date of conviction. Extends period for which license or registration issued by commission may be suspended or revoked.
Title
Relating to discipline by the Teacher Standards and Practices Commission.
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
Roll Calls
2021-06-09 - House - House Refuse to Concur (Y: 0 N: 58 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2021-06-08 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 25 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-26 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-13 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 55 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2021-04-01 - House - House Committee Do Pass (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-08 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 25 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-26 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-13 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 55 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2021-04-01 - House - House Committee Do Pass (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-09 | House | Motion to concur in Senate amendments and repass bill failed. Ayes, 0; Nays, 58--Alonso Leon, Bonham, Boshart Davis, Breese-Iverson, Bynum, Campos, Cate, Clem, Dexter, Drazan, Fahey, Gomberg, Grayber, Hayden, Helm, Holvey, Hudson, Kropf, Leif, Levy, Lewis, Lively, Marsh, McLain, Meek, Moore-Green, Morgan, Nathanson, Neron, Noble, Nosse, Owens, Pham, Post, Power, Prusak, Rayfield, Reardon, Reschke, Reynolds, Ruiz, Salinas, Sanchez, Schouten, Smith DB, Smith G, Smith Warner, Sollman, Speaker Kotek, Stark, Valderrama, Wallan, Weber, Wilde, Williams, Witt, Wright, Zika; Excused, 1--Evans. |
2021-06-08 | Senate | Vote explanation(s) filed by Heard. |
2021-06-08 | Senate | Third reading. Carried by Dembrow. Passed. Ayes, 25; Nays, 5--Findley, Heard, Kennemer, Knopp, Riley. |
2021-06-07 | Senate | Second reading. |
2021-06-03 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) |
2021-05-26 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2021-05-05 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2021-04-15 | Senate | Referred to Education. |
2021-04-14 | Senate | First reading. Referred to President's desk. |
2021-04-13 | House | Third reading. Carried by Smith DB. Passed. Ayes, 55; Excused, 4--Drazan, Levy, Rayfield, Ruiz; Excused for Business of the House, 1--Bynum. |
2021-04-12 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to April 13, 2021 Calendar. |
2021-04-10 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to April 12, 2021 Calendar. |
2021-04-09 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to April 10, 2021 Calendar. |
2021-04-08 | House | Carried over to April 9, 2021 Calendar by virtue of adjournment. |
2021-04-07 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to April 8, 2021 Calendar. |
2021-04-06 | House | Carried over to April 7, 2021 Calendar by virtue of adjournment. |
2021-04-05 | House | Second reading. |
2021-04-02 | House | Recommendation: Do pass. |
2021-04-01 | House | Work Session held. |
2021-03-30 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2021-01-19 | House | Referred to Education. |
2021-01-11 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |