OR HB2134 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Failed on June 26 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-26 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Failed on June 26 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-26 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Defines "positive identification" for purposes of motion to set aside conviction, citation, charge or arrest. Defines "positive identification" for purposes of motion to set aside conviction, citation, charge or arrest. Requires prosecuting attorney to provide affidavit to Department of State Police explaining discrepancy between criminal history of movant and conviction, citation, charge or arrest that is subject of motion. Directs court to ensure fingerprints of defendant are submitted to Department of State Police upon conviction for felony or misdemeanor. Specifies information that must accompany fingerprints.
Title
Relating to the identification of a person filing a motion to set aside.
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-26 | House | In committee upon adjournment. |
2021-03-04 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2021-01-19 | House | Referred to Judiciary. |
2021-01-11 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |
Oregon State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2021R1/Measures/Overview/HB2134 |
Text | https://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2021R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/HB2134/Introduced |