OR HB2132 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on September 25 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-09-25 - Chapter 213, (2021 Laws): Effective date June 11, 2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on September 25 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-09-25 - Chapter 213, (2021 Laws): Effective date June 11, 2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Modifies provisions relating to criminal records checks. Modifies provisions relating to criminal records checks. Declares emergency, effective on passage.
Title
Relating to criminal records checks; and declaring an emergency.
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
Roll Calls
2021-06-01 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 26 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-05-18 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-08 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 55 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2021-03-11 - House - House Committee Do Pass (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-18 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-08 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 55 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2021-03-11 - House - House Committee Do Pass (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-09-25 | House | Chapter 213, (2021 Laws): Effective date June 11, 2021. |
2021-06-11 | House | Governor signed. |
2021-06-07 | Senate | President signed. |
2021-06-02 | House | Speaker signed. |
2021-06-01 | Senate | Third reading. Carried by Prozanski. Passed. Ayes, 26; Nays, 2--Boquist, Robinson; Excused, 2--Heard, Thatcher. |
2021-05-28 | Senate | Second reading. |
2021-05-28 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass. |
2021-05-18 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2021-04-21 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2021-04-15 | Senate | Referred to Judiciary and Ballot Measure 110 Implementation. |
2021-04-12 | Senate | First reading. Referred to President's desk. |
2021-04-08 | House | Third reading. Carried by Morgan. Passed. Ayes, 55; Excused, 5--Alonso Leon, Bynum, Clem, Smith G, Speaker Kotek. |
2021-04-07 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to April 8, 2021 Calendar. |
2021-04-06 | House | Carried over to April 7, 2021 Calendar by virtue of adjournment. |
2021-04-05 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to April 6, 2021 Calendar. |
2021-04-01 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to April 5, 2021 Calendar. |
2021-03-31 | House | Carried over to April 1, 2021 Calendar by virtue of adjournment. |
2021-03-30 | House | Carried over to March 31, 2021 Calendar by virtue of adjournment. |
2021-03-29 | House | Carried over to March 30, 2021 Calendar by virtue of adjournment. |
2021-03-24 | House | Carried over to March 29, 2021 Calendar by virtue of adjournment. |
2021-03-22 | House | Second reading. |
2021-03-18 | House | Recommendation: Do pass. |
2021-03-11 | House | Work Session held. |
2021-03-04 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2021-01-19 | House | Referred to Judiciary. |
2021-01-11 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |