OR HB2130 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on September 25 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-09-25 - Chapter 9, (2021 Laws): Effective date September 25, 2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on September 25 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-09-25 - Chapter 9, (2021 Laws): Effective date September 25, 2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Extends, to conform with income tax return due date frequently delayed if due date falls on weekend or based on observation of Emancipation Day holiday in District of Columbia, date for filing declaration of estimated tax and making estimated tax installment payment. Extends, to conform with income tax return due date frequently delayed if due date falls on weekend or based on observation of Emancipation Day holiday in District of Columbia, date for filing declaration of estimated tax and making estimated tax installment payment. Applies to declarations of estimated tax due in tax years beginning on or after January 1, 2022. Takes effect on 91st day following adjournment sine die.
Title
Relating to due date for filing declaration of estimated tax; and prescribing an effective date.
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
Roll Calls
2021-04-19 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 29 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-08 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-15 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 56 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-03-03 - House - House Committee Do Pass (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-04-08 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-15 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 56 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-03-03 - House - House Committee Do Pass (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-09-25 | House | Chapter 9, (2021 Laws): Effective date September 25, 2021. |
2021-04-30 | House | Governor signed. |
2021-04-21 | Senate | President signed. |
2021-04-20 | House | Speaker signed. |
2021-04-19 | Senate | Vote explanation(s) filed by Heard. |
2021-04-19 | Senate | Third reading. Carried by Findley. Passed. Ayes, 29; Nays, 1--Heard. |
2021-04-15 | Senate | Second reading. |
2021-04-15 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass. |
2021-04-08 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2021-04-05 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2021-03-24 | Senate | Referred to Finance and Revenue. |
2021-03-17 | Senate | First reading. Referred to President's desk. |
2021-03-15 | House | Third reading. Carried by Reschke. Passed. Ayes, 56; Excused, 3--Evans, Leif, Rayfield. |
2021-03-09 | House | Second reading. |
2021-03-09 | House | Recommendation: Do pass. |
2021-03-03 | House | Work Session held. |
2021-02-08 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2021-01-19 | House | Referred to Revenue. |
2021-01-11 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |