OR HB2130 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on August 1 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-08-01 - Chapter 578, (2019 Laws): Effective date September 29, 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on August 1 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-08-01 - Chapter 578, (2019 Laws): Effective date September 29, 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Creates and extends sunsets for certain property tax exemption programs. Creates and extends sunsets for certain property tax exemption and special assessment] programs. Takes effect on 91st day following adjournment sine die.
Title
Relating to sunsets for certain ad valorem property tax relief programs; and prescribing an effective date.
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
Roll Calls
2019-06-29 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-06-29 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-20 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-06-18 - House - House Committee Do Pass the A-Eng bill (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-06-17 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments and be referred to Tax Expenditures. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-05 - House - House Committee Without recommendation as to passage and be referred to Revenue (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-29 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-20 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-06-18 - House - House Committee Do Pass the A-Eng bill (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-06-17 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments and be referred to Tax Expenditures. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-05 - House - House Committee Without recommendation as to passage and be referred to Revenue (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-08-01 | House | Chapter 578, (2019 Laws): Effective date September 29, 2019. |
2019-07-23 | House | Governor signed. |
2019-07-03 | Senate | President signed. |
2019-07-02 | House | Speaker signed. |
2019-06-29 | Senate | Rules suspended. Third reading. Carried by Riley. Passed. Ayes, 27; Absent, 2--Girod, Linthicum; Excused, 1--Boquist. |
2019-06-29 | Senate | Rules suspended. Second reading. |
2019-06-29 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass the A-Eng. bill. |
2019-06-29 | Senate | Referred to Tax Expenditures. |
2019-06-29 | Senate | First reading. Referred to President's desk. |
2019-06-20 | House | Third reading. Carried by Findley. Passed. Ayes, 58; Excused for Business of the House, 2--McKeown, Smith Warner. |
2019-06-19 | House | Second reading. |
2019-06-19 | House | Recommendation: Do pass. |
2019-06-18 | House | Work Session held. |
2019-06-17 | House | Referred to Tax Expenditures by order of Speaker. |
2019-06-17 | House | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments, be printed A-Engrossed, and be referred to Tax Expenditures. |
2019-06-17 | House | Work Session held. |
2019-06-06 | House | Work Session held. |
2019-04-15 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2019-03-28 | House | Work Session held. |
2019-03-05 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2019-02-08 | House | Referred to Revenue by order of Speaker. |
2019-02-08 | House | Without recommendation as to passage and be referred to Revenue. |
2019-02-05 | House | Work Session held. |
2019-01-18 | House | Referred to Agriculture and Land Use. |
2019-01-14 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |