OR HB2128 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Failed on July 7 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-07 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Failed on July 7 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-07 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Deletes requirement that pseudoephedrine be classified as Schedule III controlled substance. Directs State Board of Pharmacy to adopt rules for dispensing pseudoephedrine. Requires rules to be consistent with provisions of federal Controlled Substances Act that are related to dispensing of pseudoephedrine and federal regulations that implement those provisions. Punishes violation of rules by five years' imprisonment, $125,000 fine, or both. Becomes operative January 1, 2018. Takes effect on 91st day following adjournment sine die.
Title
Relating to pseudoephedrine; prescribing an effective date.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-07-07 | House | In committee upon adjournment. |
2017-03-10 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2017-01-17 | House | Referred to Health Care. |
2017-01-09 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |
Oregon State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2017R1/Measures/Overview/HB2128 |
Text | https://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2017R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/HB2128/Introduced |