OR HB2127 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on July 24 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-07-24 - Chapter 221, (2023 Laws): Effective date June 30, 2023.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on July 24 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-07-24 - Chapter 221, (2023 Laws): Effective date June 30, 2023.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Removes deadline by which City of Pendleton must apply to Land Conservation and Development Commission to become part of affordable housing pilot program. Requires Department of Land Conservation and Development to study changes to Land Conservation and Development Commission and abolishment of Land Use Board of Appeals. Directs department to submit findings to interim committees of Legislative Assembly related to land use no later than September 15, 2024.] Removes deadline by which City of Pendleton must apply to Land Conservation and Development Commission to become part of affordable housing pilot program. Declares emergency, effective on passage.
Title
Relating to land use; and declaring an emergency.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-06-21 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2023-05-08 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-04-13 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 54 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2023-03-30 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-08 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-04-13 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 54 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2023-03-30 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-07-24 | House | Chapter 221, (2023 Laws): Effective date June 30, 2023. |
2023-06-30 | House | Governor signed. |
2023-06-24 | Senate | President signed. |
2023-06-24 | House | Speaker signed. |
2023-06-21 | Senate | Vote explanation(s) filed by Knopp. |
2023-06-21 | Senate | Third reading. Carried by Hansell. Passed. Ayes, 25; Absent, 5--Boquist, Hayden, Linthicum, Robinson, Thatcher. |
2023-06-20 | Senate | Carried over to 06-21 by unanimous consent. |
2023-06-16 | Senate | Carried over to 06-20 by unanimous consent. |
2023-06-15 | Senate | Second reading. |
2023-06-15 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass the A-Eng. bill. |
2023-05-08 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2023-04-26 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2023-04-17 | Senate | Referred to Housing and Development. |
2023-04-13 | Senate | First reading. Referred to President's desk. |
2023-04-13 | House | Third reading. Carried by Levy B. Passed. Ayes, 54; Excused, 6--Bynum, Goodwin, Javadi, Nathanson, Pham H, Wright. |
2023-04-12 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to April 13, 2023 Calendar. |
2023-04-11 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to April 12, 2023 Calendar. |
2023-04-10 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to April 11, 2023 Calendar. |
2023-04-06 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to April 10, 2023 Calendar. |
2023-04-05 | House | Second reading. |
2023-04-04 | House | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments and be printed A-Engrossed. |
2023-03-30 | House | Work Session held. |
2023-03-27 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2023-01-11 | House | Referred to Agriculture, Land Use, Natural Resources, and Water. |
2023-01-09 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |