OR HB2127 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on June 10 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-10 - Chapter 203, (2019 Laws): Effective date January 1, 2020.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on June 10 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-10 - Chapter 203, (2019 Laws): Effective date January 1, 2020.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Eliminates sunset for provisions granting exemptions from filing and payment of taxes and from establishment of domicile in state to companies and workers in state solely to perform disaster and emergency related work. Extends sunset for exemption from income or corporate excise taxes of capital gains from sale of manufactured dwelling park to certain entities. Creates] Eliminates sunset for provisions granting exemptions from filing and payment of taxes and from establishment of domicile in state to companies and workers in state solely to perform disaster and emergency related work. Takes effect on 91st day following adjournment sine die.].
Title
Relating to tax expenditures.
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
Roll Calls
2019-05-23 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-05-16 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-24 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 57 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-04-18 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-04 - House - House Committee Do pass and be referred to Revenue by prior reference (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-16 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-24 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 57 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-04-18 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-04 - House - House Committee Do pass and be referred to Revenue by prior reference (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-10 | House | Chapter 203, (2019 Laws): Effective date January 1, 2020. |
2019-06-04 | House | Governor signed. |
2019-05-28 | Senate | President signed. |
2019-05-24 | House | Speaker signed. |
2019-05-23 | Senate | Third reading. Carried by Boquist. Passed. Ayes, 28; Excused, 2--Olsen, Winters. |
2019-05-22 | Senate | Carried over to 05-23 by unanimous consent. |
2019-05-21 | Senate | Second reading. |
2019-05-21 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass the A-Eng. bill. |
2019-05-16 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2019-05-09 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2019-04-26 | Senate | Referred to Finance and Revenue. |
2019-04-25 | Senate | First reading. Referred to President's desk. |
2019-04-24 | House | Third reading. Carried by Marsh. Passed. Ayes, 57; Excused, 2--Nearman, Smith G; Excused for Business of the House, 1--Nathanson. |
2019-04-23 | House | Second reading. |
2019-04-22 | House | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments and be printed A-Engrossed. |
2019-04-18 | House | Work Session held. |
2019-04-03 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2019-03-08 | House | Referred to Revenue by prior reference. |
2019-03-08 | House | Recommendation: Do pass and be referred to Revenue by prior reference. |
2019-03-04 | House | Work Session held. |
2019-02-25 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2019-01-18 | House | Referred to Human Services and Housing with subsequent referral to Revenue. |
2019-01-14 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |