OR HB2119 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on September 25 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-09-25 - Chapter 111, (2021 Laws): Effective date January 01, 2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on September 25 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-09-25 - Chapter 111, (2021 Laws): Effective date January 01, 2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Transfers responsibility for 2-1-1 system from Office of Emergency Management to Department of Human Services. Transfers responsibility for 2-1-1 system from Office of Emergency Management to Department of Human Services. Modifies terminology related to 2-1-1 system. Repeals law relating to duty to contract for creation of 2-1-1 system. Modifies laws relating to financial contributions for 2-1-1 system.
Title
Relating to the 2-1-1 system.
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
Roll Calls
2021-05-19 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 21 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-05-11 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-12 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 56 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-03-24 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-05-11 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-12 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 56 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-03-24 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-09-25 | House | Chapter 111, (2021 Laws): Effective date January 01, 2022. |
2021-06-01 | House | Governor signed. |
2021-05-25 | Senate | President signed. |
2021-05-20 | House | Speaker signed. |
2021-05-19 | Senate | Vote explanation(s) filed by Boquist, Heard. |
2021-05-19 | Senate | Third reading. Carried by Gelser. Passed. Ayes, 21; Nays, 7--Boquist, Girod, Heard, Kennemer, Linthicum, Robinson, Thomsen; Excused, 2--Anderson, Thatcher. |
2021-05-18 | Senate | Second reading. |
2021-05-18 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass the A-Eng. bill. |
2021-05-11 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2021-05-04 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2021-04-15 | Senate | Referred to Human Services, Mental Health and Recovery. |
2021-04-14 | Senate | First reading. Referred to President's desk. |
2021-04-12 | House | Third reading. Carried by Schouten. Passed. Ayes, 56; Nays, 1--Wilde; Excused, 2--Clem, Levy; Excused for Business of the House, 1--Speaker Kotek. |
2021-04-10 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to April 12, 2021 Calendar. |
2021-04-09 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to April 10, 2021 Calendar. |
2021-04-08 | House | Carried over to April 9, 2021 Calendar by virtue of adjournment. |
2021-04-07 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to April 8, 2021 Calendar. |
2021-04-06 | House | Carried over to April 7, 2021 Calendar by virtue of adjournment. |
2021-04-05 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to April 6, 2021 Calendar. |
2021-04-01 | House | Second reading. |
2021-03-30 | House | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments and be printed A-Engrossed. |
2021-03-24 | House | Work Session held. |
2021-02-24 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2021-01-19 | House | Referred to Human Services. |
2021-01-11 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |