OR HB2115 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Failed on June 26 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-26 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Failed on June 26 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-26 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizes Oregon Board of Licensed Professional Counselors and Therapists to sanction applicants for licensure and licensees for unprofessional conduct. Authorizes Oregon Board of Licensed Professional Counselors and Therapists to sanction applicants for licensure and licensees for unprofessional conduct. Takes effect on 91st day following adjournment sine die.
Title
Relating to Oregon Board of Licensed Professional Counselors and Therapists disciplinary authority; prescribing an effective date.
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
Roll Calls
2021-01-28 - House - House Committee Without recommendation as to passage and be referred to Behavioral Health (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-26 | House | In committee upon adjournment. |
2021-02-03 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2021-01-29 | House | Referred to Behavioral Health by order of Speaker. |
2021-01-29 | House | Without recommendation as to passage and be referred to Behavioral Health. |
2021-01-28 | House | Work Session held. |
2021-01-19 | House | Referred to Health Care. |
2021-01-11 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |