OR HB2114 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Failed on June 26 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-26 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Failed on June 26 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-26 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizes Oregon Board of Psychology to assess costs associated with disciplinary action to person against whom disciplinary action is taken. Authorizes Oregon Board of Psychology to assess costs associated with disciplinary action to person against whom disciplinary action is taken. Takes effect on 91st day following adjournment sine die.
Title
Relating to Oregon Board of Psychology; prescribing an effective date.
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
Roll Calls
2021-03-24 - House - House Committee Do Pass (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-28 - House - House Committee Without recommendation as to passage and be referred to Behavioral Health (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-28 - House - House Committee Without recommendation as to passage and be referred to Behavioral Health (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-26 | House | In committee upon adjournment. |
2021-04-09 | House | Motion to rerefer to Behavioral Health carried. Rereferred. |
2021-04-09 | House | Third reading. Carried by Moore-Green. |
2021-04-08 | House | Carried over to April 9, 2021 Calendar by virtue of adjournment. |
2021-04-07 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to April 8, 2021 Calendar. |
2021-04-06 | House | Carried over to April 7, 2021 Calendar by virtue of adjournment. |
2021-04-05 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to April 6, 2021 Calendar. |
2021-04-01 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to April 5, 2021 Calendar. |
2021-03-31 | House | Carried over to April 1, 2021 Calendar by virtue of adjournment. |
2021-03-30 | House | Second reading. |
2021-03-26 | House | Recommendation: Do pass. |
2021-03-24 | House | Work Session held. |
2021-02-03 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2021-01-29 | House | Referred to Behavioral Health by order of Speaker. |
2021-01-29 | House | Without recommendation as to passage and be referred to Behavioral Health. |
2021-01-28 | House | Work Session held. |
2021-01-19 | House | Referred to Health Care. |
2021-01-11 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |