OR HB2108 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on September 25 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-09-25 - Chapter 59, (2021 Laws): Effective date January 01, 2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on September 25 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-09-25 - Chapter 59, (2021 Laws): Effective date January 01, 2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Removes requirement that independent residence facilities be licensed as child-caring agencies. Removes requirement that independent residence facilities be licensed as child-caring agencies.
Title
Relating to independent residence facilities.
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
Roll Calls
2021-05-12 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 26 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-04-27 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-05 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-03-10 - House - House Committee Do Pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-27 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-05 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-03-10 - House - House Committee Do Pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-09-25 | House | Chapter 59, (2021 Laws): Effective date January 01, 2022. |
2021-05-21 | House | Governor signed. |
2021-05-14 | Senate | President signed. |
2021-05-13 | House | Speaker signed. |
2021-05-12 | Senate | Vote explanation(s) filed by Heard. |
2021-05-12 | Senate | Third reading. Carried by Lieber. Passed. Ayes, 26; Nays, 2--Heard, Thomsen; Excused, 2--Kennemer, Manning Jr. |
2021-05-11 | Senate | Second reading. |
2021-05-11 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass. |
2021-04-27 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2021-04-20 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2021-04-12 | Senate | Referred to Human Services, Mental Health and Recovery. |
2021-04-07 | Senate | First reading. Referred to President's desk. |
2021-04-05 | House | Third reading. Carried by Noble. Passed. Ayes, 58; Excused, 2--Boshart Davis, Clem. |
2021-04-01 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to April 5, 2021 Calendar. |
2021-03-31 | House | Carried over to April 1, 2021 Calendar by virtue of adjournment. |
2021-03-30 | House | Carried over to March 31, 2021 Calendar by virtue of adjournment. |
2021-03-29 | House | Carried over to March 30, 2021 Calendar by virtue of adjournment. |
2021-03-24 | House | Carried over to March 29, 2021 Calendar by virtue of adjournment. |
2021-03-22 | House | Carried over to March 24, 2021 Calendar by virtue of adjournment. |
2021-03-16 | House | Second reading. |
2021-03-15 | House | Recommendation: Do pass. |
2021-03-10 | House | Work Session held. |
2021-02-10 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2021-01-19 | House | Referred to Human Services. |
2021-01-11 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |