OR HB2107 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on September 25 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-09-25 - Chapter 58, (2021 Laws): Effective date January 01, 2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on September 25 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-09-25 - Chapter 58, (2021 Laws): Effective date January 01, 2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Provides that notice of garnishment related to overpayment of public benefits issued by Department of Human Services or Oregon Health Authority need not be signed by person issuing notice on behalf of department or authority. Provides that notice of garnishment related to overpayment of public benefits issued by Department of Human Services or Oregon Health Authority need not be signed by person issuing notice on behalf of department or authority. Directs supervisory authority of county to provide specified information to Oregon Health Authority and Department of Human Services when defendant is committed to custody of supervisory authority.
Title
Relating to the overpayment of public benefits.
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
Roll Calls
2021-05-11 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 26 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-27 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-05 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-03-10 - House - House Committee Do Pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-27 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-05 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-03-10 - House - House Committee Do Pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-09-25 | House | Chapter 58, (2021 Laws): Effective date January 01, 2022. |
2021-05-21 | House | Governor signed. |
2021-05-14 | Senate | President signed. |
2021-05-13 | House | Speaker signed. |
2021-05-11 | Senate | Vote explanation(s) filed by Heard. |
2021-05-11 | Senate | Third reading. Carried by Taylor. Passed. Ayes, 26; Nays, 4--Boquist, Heard, Linthicum, Thatcher. |
2021-05-10 | Senate | Second reading. |
2021-05-10 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass. |
2021-04-27 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2021-04-20 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2021-04-12 | Senate | Referred to Human Services, Mental Health and Recovery. |
2021-04-07 | Senate | First reading. Referred to President's desk. |
2021-04-05 | House | Third reading. Carried by Ruiz. Passed. Ayes, 59; Excused, 1--Clem. |
2021-04-01 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to April 5, 2021 Calendar. |
2021-03-31 | House | Carried over to April 1, 2021 Calendar by virtue of adjournment. |
2021-03-30 | House | Carried over to March 31, 2021 Calendar by virtue of adjournment. |
2021-03-29 | House | Carried over to March 30, 2021 Calendar by virtue of adjournment. |
2021-03-24 | House | Carried over to March 29, 2021 Calendar by virtue of adjournment. |
2021-03-22 | House | Carried over to March 24, 2021 Calendar by virtue of adjournment. |
2021-03-16 | House | Second reading. |
2021-03-15 | House | Recommendation: Do pass. |
2021-03-10 | House | Work Session held. |
2021-02-08 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2021-01-19 | House | Referred to Human Services. |
2021-01-11 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |