OR HB2106 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Failed on June 26 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-26 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Failed on June 26 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-26 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Renames Children's Advocate to Human Services Ombudsperson. Renames Children's Advocate to Human Services Ombudsperson. Renames Office of Children's Advocate to Office of the Human Services Ombuds. Expands scope of office duties to include matters relating to elderly person and vulnerable adult abuse. Authorizes Director of Human Services to terminate Human Services Ombudsperson for just cause.
Title
Relating to the Office of the Human Services Ombuds.
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
Roll Calls
2021-04-15 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 52 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-03-10 - House - House Committee Do pass and rescind subsequent referral to Ways and Means (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-10 - House - House Committee Do pass and rescind subsequent referral to Ways and Means (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-26 | Senate | In committee upon adjournment. |
2021-04-29 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2021-04-23 | Senate | Referred to Human Services, Mental Health and Recovery. |
2021-04-19 | Senate | First reading. Referred to President's desk. |
2021-04-15 | House | Third reading. Carried by Leif. Passed. Ayes, 53; Nays, 3--Evans, Post, Reschke; Excused, 3--Breese-Iverson, Levy, Wallan; Excused for Business of the House, 1--Prusak. |
2021-04-14 | House | Carried over to April 15, 2021 Calendar by virtue of adjournment. |
2021-04-13 | House | Carried over to April 14, 2021 Calendar by virtue of adjournment. |
2021-04-12 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to April 13, 2021 Calendar. |
2021-04-10 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to April 12, 2021 Calendar. |
2021-04-09 | House | Second reading. |
2021-04-08 | House | Subsequent referral to Ways and Means rescinded by order of the Speaker. |
2021-04-08 | House | Recommendation: Do pass and subsequent referral to Ways and Means be rescinded. |
2021-03-10 | House | Work Session held. |
2021-02-08 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2021-01-19 | House | Referred to Human Services with subsequent referral to Ways and Means. |
2021-01-11 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |