OR HB2102 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on September 25 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-09-25 - Chapter 209, (2021 Laws): Effective date June 11, 2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on September 25 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-09-25 - Chapter 209, (2021 Laws): Effective date June 11, 2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Requires Department of Human Services to report to interim committees of Legislative Assembly related to human services , by December 31, 2022, comprehensive proposal for department staffing that meets specified criteria. Requires Department of Human Services to report to interim committees of Legislative Assembly related to human services any changes needed to statutes governing programs administered by department due to changes to budget], by December 31, 2022, comprehensive proposal for department staffing that meets specified criteria. Declares emergency, effective on passage.
Title
Relating to programs administered by the Department of Human Services; and declaring an emergency.
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
Roll Calls
2021-06-01 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 26 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-05-20 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass the A-Eng bill (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-04-15 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-03-31 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-20 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass the A-Eng bill (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-04-15 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-03-31 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-09-25 | House | Chapter 209, (2021 Laws): Effective date June 11, 2021. |
2021-06-11 | House | Governor signed. |
2021-06-07 | Senate | President signed. |
2021-06-02 | House | Speaker signed. |
2021-06-01 | Senate | Third reading. Carried by Gelser. Passed. Ayes, 26; Nays, 2--Boquist, Linthicum; Excused, 2--Heard, Thatcher. |
2021-05-28 | Senate | Second reading. |
2021-05-28 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass the A-Eng. bill. |
2021-05-20 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2021-05-13 | Senate | Work Session cancelled. |
2021-04-29 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2021-04-23 | Senate | Referred to Human Services, Mental Health and Recovery. |
2021-04-19 | Senate | First reading. Referred to President's desk. |
2021-04-15 | House | Third reading. Carried by Williams. Passed. Ayes, 58; Excused, 2--Drazan, Levy. |
2021-04-14 | House | Carried over to April 15, 2021 Calendar by virtue of adjournment. |
2021-04-13 | House | Carried over to April 14, 2021 Calendar by virtue of adjournment. |
2021-04-12 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to April 13, 2021 Calendar. |
2021-04-10 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to April 12, 2021 Calendar. |
2021-04-09 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to April 10, 2021 Calendar. |
2021-04-08 | House | Second reading. |
2021-04-06 | House | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments and be printed A-Engrossed. |
2021-03-31 | House | Work Session held. |
2021-03-29 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2021-01-19 | House | Referred to Human Services. |
2021-01-11 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |