OR HB2102 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on May 24 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-24 - Chapter 133, (2019 Laws): effective on the 91st day following adjournment sine die.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on May 24 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-24 - Chapter 133, (2019 Laws): effective on the 91st day following adjournment sine die.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Allows Department of Revenue to disclose taxpayer information to multijurisdictional information sharing organization formed to combat identity theft and fraud and to member tax preparation software vendors. Takes effect on 91st day following adjournment sine die.
Title
Relating to disclosure of taxpayer information for fraud prevention; and prescribing an effective date.
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
Roll Calls
2019-05-14 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 21 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-05-08 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-04-01 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 56 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-03-25 - House - House Committee Do Pass (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-05-08 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-04-01 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 56 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-03-25 - House - House Committee Do Pass (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-24 | House | Chapter 133, (2019 Laws): effective on the 91st day following adjournment sine die. |
2019-05-22 | House | Governor signed. |
2019-05-15 | Senate | President signed. |
2019-05-15 | House | Speaker signed. |
2019-05-14 | Senate | Third reading. Carried by Hass. Passed. Ayes, 21; Nays, 8--Baertschiger Jr, Bentz, Boquist, Girod, Linthicum, Olsen, Thatcher, Thomsen; Excused, 1--Winters. |
2019-05-13 | Senate | Second reading. |
2019-05-13 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass. |
2019-05-08 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2019-04-17 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Referred to Finance and Revenue. |
2019-04-02 | Senate | First reading. Referred to President's desk. |
2019-04-01 | House | Third reading. Carried by Hernandez. Passed. Ayes, 56; Excused, 4--Bynum, Keny-Guyer, Leif, Piluso. |
2019-03-28 | House | Second reading. |
2019-03-27 | House | Recommendation: Do pass. |
2019-03-25 | House | Work Session held. |
2019-01-31 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2019-01-18 | House | Referred to Revenue. |
2019-01-14 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |