OR HB2101 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-2)
Status: Passed on August 18 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-08-18 - Chapter 654, (2017 Laws): Effective date October 6, 2017.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-2)
Status: Passed on August 18 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-08-18 - Chapter 654, (2017 Laws): Effective date October 6, 2017.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Directs Legislative Counsel to prepare open government impact statement for measures that affect disclosure, or exemption from disclosure, of public records. Establishes Oregon Sunshine Committee to establish schedule of review for exemptions from disclosure for public records. Directs Oregon Sunshine Committee to submit report to Legislative Counsel Committee subcommittee on public records and include in report recommended changes to public records process and recommendations to amend or repeal exemptions from disclosure. Directs Legislative Counsel Committee to establish public records subcommittee to review report from Oregon Sunshine Committee and submit report to Legislative Counsel Committee. Takes effect on 91st day following adjournment sine die.
Title
Relating to public records; and prescribing an effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-07-06 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 27 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-07-05 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-07-01 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments to the A-Eng bill. (Printed B-Eng.) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-06-19 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments and be referred to Ways and Means. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-07-05 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-07-01 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments to the A-Eng bill. (Printed B-Eng.) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-06-19 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments and be referred to Ways and Means. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-08-18 | House | Chapter 654, (2017 Laws): Effective date October 6, 2017. |
2017-08-08 | House | Governor signed. |
2017-07-18 | Senate | President signed. |
2017-07-11 | House | Speaker signed. |
2017-07-06 | Senate | Rules suspended. Third reading. Carried by DeBoer. Passed.Ayes, 27; nays, 3--Baertschiger Jr, Boquist, Riley. |
2017-07-06 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass the B-Eng. bill. |
2017-07-06 | Senate | Rules suspended. Second reading. |
2017-07-06 | Senate | Referred to Ways and Means. |
2017-07-06 | Senate | First reading. Referred to President's desk. |
2017-07-05 | House | Rules suspended. Third reading. Carried by Huffman. Passed.Ayes, 59; Excused, 1--Boone. |
2017-07-05 | House | Second reading. |
2017-07-04 | House | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments and be printed B-Engrossed. |
2017-07-01 | House | Work Session held. |
2017-06-29 | House | Returned to Full Committee. |
2017-06-29 | House | Public Hearing and Work Session held. |
2017-06-28 | House | Assigned to Subcommittee On General Government. |
2017-06-22 | House | Referred to Ways and Means by order of Speaker. |
2017-06-22 | House | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments, be printed A-Engrossed, and be referred to Ways and Means. |
2017-06-19 | House | Work Session held. |
2017-04-25 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2017-04-13 | House | Public Hearing cancelled. |
2017-02-21 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2017-01-17 | House | Referred to Rules. |
2017-01-09 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |