OR HB2099 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on August 18 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-08-18 - Chapter 704, (2017 Laws): Effective date August 15, 2017.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on August 18 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-08-18 - Chapter 704, (2017 Laws): Effective date August 15, 2017.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Changes water management and conservation plan approval condition for extension of time to construct works or perfect right for municipal use of water. Prohibits issuance of water right certificate for municipal use if extension of time is required but order approving extension has not become final. Declares emergency, effective on passage.
Title
Relating to community water supply; and declaring an emergency.
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
Roll Calls
2017-07-05 - House - House Third Reading in Concurrence (Y: 38 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-06-06 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 21 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-01 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments to the A-Eng bill. (Printed B-Eng.) (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-02 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 35 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-04-18 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-06-06 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 21 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-01 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments to the A-Eng bill. (Printed B-Eng.) (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-02 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 35 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-04-18 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-08-18 | House | Chapter 704, (2017 Laws): Effective date August 15, 2017. |
2017-08-15 | House | Governor signed. |
2017-07-18 | Senate | President signed. |
2017-07-11 | House | Speaker signed. |
2017-07-05 | House | House concurred in Senate amendments and repassed bill.Ayes, 38; Nays, 21--Barreto, Bentz, Esquivel, Hack, Hayden, Heard, Huffman, Johnson, Kennemer, Lewis, Nearman, Noble, Olson, Parrish, Post, Reardon, Reschke, Sprenger, Stark, Vial, Wilson; Excused, 1--Boone. |
2017-06-06 | Senate | Third reading. Carried by Dembrow. Passed.Ayes, 21; nays, 9--Baertschiger Jr, Ferrioli, Girod, Kruse, Linthicum, Olsen, Thatcher, Thomsen, Winters. |
2017-06-05 | Senate | Second reading. |
2017-06-02 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments to the A-Eng. bill. (Printed B-Eng.) |
2017-06-01 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2017-05-31 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2017-05-05 | Senate | Referred to Environment and Natural Resources. |
2017-05-03 | Senate | First reading. Referred to President's desk. |
2017-05-02 | House | Third reading. Carried by Clem. Passed.Ayes, 35; Nays, 23--Alonso Leon, Barnhart, Evans, Fahey, Gomberg, Greenlick, Helm, Hernandez, Holvey, Keny-Guyer, Lininger, Malstrom, Marsh, Meek, Nathanson, Nosse, Power, Rayfield, Sanchez, Smith Warner, Sollman, Williamson, Speaker Kotek; Excused, 2--Heard, Smith G. |
2017-05-01 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to May 2, 2017 Calendar. |
2017-04-27 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to May 1, 2017 Calendar. |
2017-04-26 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to April 27, 2017 Calendar. |
2017-04-25 | House | Second reading. |
2017-04-24 | House | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments and be printed A-Engrossed. |
2017-04-18 | House | Work Session held. |
2017-04-13 | House | Work Session held. |
2017-03-09 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2017-01-17 | House | Referred to Agriculture and Natural Resources. |
2017-01-09 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |