OR HB2098 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on July 25 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-07-25 - Chapter 641, (2013 Laws): Effective date July 25, 2013.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on July 25 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-07-25 - Chapter 641, (2013 Laws): Effective date July 25, 2013.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Adjusts method for calculating additional amount of weighted average daily membership attributed to students in poverty families for purposes of State School Fund distributions.
Title
Relating to State School Fund calculations; and declaring an emergency.
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-07-25 | House | Chapter 641, (2013 Laws): Effective date July 25, 2013. |
2013-07-25 | House | Governor signed. |
2013-07-03 | Senate | President signed. |
2013-07-01 | House | Speaker signed. |
2013-06-27 | Senate | Third reading. Carried by Girod. Passed. Ayes, 27; nays, 1--Hass; excused, 2--Dingfelder, Edwards. |
2013-06-26 | Senate | Second reading. |
2013-06-26 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass the B-Eng. bill. |
2013-06-24 | Senate | Referred to Ways and Means. |
2013-06-20 | Senate | First reading. Referred to President's desk. |
2013-06-19 | House | Third reading. Carried by Sprenger. Passed. Ayes, 60. |
2013-06-17 | House | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments and be printed B-Engrossed. |
2013-06-14 | House | Work Session held. |
2013-06-12 | House | Work Session held. |
2013-06-06 | House | Returned to Full Committee. |
2013-06-06 | House | Work Session held. |
2013-05-16 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2013-05-07 | House | Assigned to Subcommittee On Education. |
2013-05-01 | House | Third Reading. Motion to refer to Ways and Means carried. Referred. |
2013-04-30 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to May 1, 2013 Calendar. |
2013-04-29 | House | Second reading. |
2013-04-26 | House | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments and be printed A-Engrossed. |
2013-04-22 | House | Work Session held. |
2013-04-12 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2013-04-02 | House | Referred to Revenue by prior reference. |
2013-04-02 | House | Recommendation: Do pass and be referred to Revenue by prior reference. |
2013-03-27 | House | Public Hearing and Work Session held. |
2013-01-22 | House | Referred to Education with subsequent referral to Revenue. |
2013-01-14 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |