OR HB2092 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on September 25 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-09-25 - Chapter 674, (2021 Laws): Effective date January 01, 2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on September 25 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-09-25 - Chapter 674, (2021 Laws): Effective date January 01, 2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Alters scope of duties and data collection requirements for Oregon Youth Employment Program. Alters scope of duties and data collection requirements for Oregon Youth Employment Program. Requires Higher Education Coordinating Commission, after allocating portion of program funds to Oregon Youth Corps, to provide grants to local workforce development boards. Directs commission to allocate no less than 20 percent of program funds to organizations that serve communities of color. Allows program participants to receive award that is equivalent to minimum wage if participant is otherwise prohibited from receiving wages from program provider. Appropriates moneys to commission to administer grants.] Places Oregon Youth Corps and Oregon Community Stewardship Corps within Oregon Youth Employment Program.
Title
Relating to youth programs.
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
Roll Calls
2021-06-24 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 23 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-06-22 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 55 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-06-18 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments to the A-Eng bill. (Printed B-Eng.) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-04-06 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments and be referred to Ways and Means. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 9 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-22 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 55 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-06-18 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments to the A-Eng bill. (Printed B-Eng.) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-04-06 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments and be referred to Ways and Means. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 9 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-09-25 | House | Chapter 674, (2021 Laws): Effective date January 01, 2022. |
2021-08-06 | House | Governor signed. |
2021-06-26 | Senate | President signed. |
2021-06-25 | House | Speaker signed. |
2021-06-24 | Senate | Vote explanation(s) filed by Heard. |
2021-06-24 | Senate | Rules suspended. Third reading. Carried by Frederick. Passed. Ayes, 23; Nays, 5--Boquist, Heard, Linthicum, Robinson, Thatcher; Excused, 2--Burdick, Manning Jr. |
2021-06-24 | Senate | Second reading. |
2021-06-24 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass the B-Eng. bill. |
2021-06-23 | Senate | Referred to Ways and Means. |
2021-06-23 | Senate | First reading. Referred to President's desk. |
2021-06-22 | House | Rules suspended. Third reading. Carried by McLain. Passed. Ayes, 55; Nays, 1--Reschke; Excused for Business of the House, 3--Grayber, Morgan, Prusak. |
2021-06-22 | House | Second reading. |
2021-06-20 | House | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments and be printed B-Engrossed. |
2021-06-18 | House | Work Session held. |
2021-06-10 | House | Returned to Full Committee. |
2021-06-10 | House | Work Session held. |
2021-06-09 | House | Assigned to Subcommittee On Education. |
2021-04-10 | House | Referred to Ways and Means by order of Speaker. |
2021-04-10 | House | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments, be printed A-Engrossed, and be referred to Ways and Means. |
2021-04-06 | House | Work Session held. |
2021-03-04 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2021-01-19 | House | Referred to Education. |
2021-01-11 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |