OR HB2090 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on May 6 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-06 - Chapter 42, (2019 Laws): Effective date January 1, 2020.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on May 6 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-06 - Chapter 42, (2019 Laws): Effective date January 1, 2020.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Abolishes Oregon Board of Naturopathic Medicine peer review committee.
Title
Relating to naturopathic medicine.
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
Roll Calls
2019-04-22 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 26 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-04-10 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-19 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-12 - House - House Committee Do pass and be placed on the Consent Calendar (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-10 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-19 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-12 - House - House Committee Do pass and be placed on the Consent Calendar (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-06 | House | Chapter 42, (2019 Laws): Effective date January 1, 2020. |
2019-05-01 | House | Governor signed. |
2019-04-24 | Senate | President signed. |
2019-04-23 | House | Speaker signed. |
2019-04-22 | Senate | Third reading. Carried by Fagan. Passed. Ayes, 26; Nays, 1--Thomsen; Excused, 3--Hansell, Linthicum, Winters. |
2019-04-18 | Senate | Carried over to 04-22 by unanimous consent. |
2019-04-17 | Senate | Carried over to 04-18 by unanimous consent. |
2019-04-16 | Senate | Second reading. |
2019-04-16 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass. |
2019-04-10 | Senate | Public Hearing and Work Session held. |
2019-02-22 | Senate | Referred to Health Care. |
2019-02-21 | Senate | First reading. Referred to President's desk. |
2019-02-19 | House | Read third time under Consent Calendar. Passed. Ayes, 59; Excused, 1--Drazan. |
2019-02-18 | House | Second reading. |
2019-02-14 | House | Recommendation: Do pass and be placed on Consent Calendar. |
2019-02-12 | House | Work Session held. |
2019-01-29 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2019-01-18 | House | Referred to Health Care. |
2019-01-14 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |