OR HB2086 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Enrolled on May 16 2019 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-16 - Motion to lay on the table carried. Ayes, 18; Nays, 9--Baertschiger Jr, Bentz, Boquist, Girod, Hansell, Heard, Linthicum, Thatcher, Thomsen; Excused, 3--Knopp, Olsen, Winters.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Enrolled on May 16 2019 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-16 - Motion to lay on the table carried. Ayes, 18; Nays, 9--Baertschiger Jr, Bentz, Boquist, Girod, Hansell, Heard, Linthicum, Thatcher, Thomsen; Excused, 3--Knopp, Olsen, Winters.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Revises definitions and harmonizes language for purposes of program supporting working land conservation. Revises Oregon Agricultural Heritage Commission duties.
Title
Relating to working land conservation.
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
Roll Calls
2019-05-16 - Senate - Senate Motion to Table (Y: 18 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-05-16 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 14 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2019-05-13 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass the A-Eng bill (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-03-14 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-14 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 51 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-02-05 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments and be placed on the Consent Calendar. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-16 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 14 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2019-05-13 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass the A-Eng bill (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-03-14 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-14 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 51 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-02-05 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments and be placed on the Consent Calendar. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-16 | Senate | Motion to lay on the table carried. Ayes, 18; Nays, 9--Baertschiger Jr, Bentz, Boquist, Girod, Hansell, Heard, Linthicum, Thatcher, Thomsen; Excused, 3--Knopp, Olsen, Winters. |
2019-05-16 | Senate | Third reading. Carried by Dembrow. Failed. Ayes, 14; Nays, 14--Baertschiger Jr, Bentz, Beyer, Boquist, Burdick, Girod, Hansell, Heard, Johnson, Knopp, Linthicum, Riley, Thatcher, Thomsen; Excused, 2--Olsen, Winters. |
2019-05-15 | Senate | Second reading. |
2019-05-15 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass the A-Eng. bill. |
2019-05-13 | Senate | Public Hearing and Work Session held. |
2019-03-28 | Senate | Motion to refer to Rules carried by voice vote. |
2019-03-26 | Senate | Carried over to 03-28 by unanimous consent. |
2019-03-25 | Senate | Carried over to 03-26 by unanimous consent. |
2019-03-21 | Senate | Carried over to 03-25 by unanimous consent. |
2019-03-19 | Senate | Second reading. |
2019-03-19 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass the A-Eng. bill. |
2019-03-14 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2019-02-22 | Senate | Referred to Environment and Natural Resources. |
2019-02-19 | Senate | First reading. Referred to President's desk. |
2019-02-14 | House | Third reading. Carried by Clem. Passed. Ayes, 51; Nays, 7--Barreto, Bonham, Leif, Nearman, Noble, Reschke, Wallan; Excused, 1--Nathanson; Excused for Business of the House, 1--Speaker Kotek. |
2019-02-12 | House | By order of the Speaker, and in compliance with House Rule 4.05, subsection (3), HB 2086 is hereby removed from the Consent Calendar and placed on its proper order on the Thursday, February 14 Third Reading Calendar. |
2019-02-11 | House | Second reading. |
2019-02-08 | House | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments, be printed A-Engrossed, and be placed on Consent Calendar. |
2019-02-05 | House | Work Session held. |
2019-01-24 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2019-01-18 | House | Referred to Agriculture and Land Use. |
2019-01-14 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |