OR HB2085 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on June 21 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-21 - Chapter 390, (2019 Laws): effective on the 91st day following adjournment sine die.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on June 21 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-21 - Chapter 390, (2019 Laws): effective on the 91st day following adjournment sine die.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Regulates construction and removal of dams. Provides for Water Resources Department inspection of dams and related information. Requires department to notify dam owner if department concludes that dam having significant hazard rating or high hazard rating has condition allegedly rendering dam unsafe or potentially unsafe. Requires informing dam owner of maintenance action need disclosed by inspection. Establishes processes for dam owner response, cooperative development of corrective action plan or use of proposed or final order to ensure corrective action or maintenance action by dam owner. Sets forth department and Water Resources Director enforcement authority regarding dams. Requires dam owner to supply department with certain contact information if dam lacks emergency action plan. Requires dam owner to periodically review and evaluate condition of dam. Establishes department authority regarding dam emergency action plan and emergency response exercises at dam having high hazard rating. Allows department to inspect, evaluate and assess additional forms of hydraulic structure with permission of owner. Allows department to provide recommendations, technical assistance, advice and emergency plan assistance regarding hydraulic structure. Authorizes director to impose civil penalty for certain violations under dam regulation program, not to exceed $2,000 per occurrence. Authorizes director to impose civil penalty for violation of certain orders related to dam regulatory program, not to exceed $5,000] $500 per month. Makes violation of certain director or appellate court orders misdemeanor punishable by maximum of six months' incarceration, $2,500 fine, or both. Becomes operative July 1, 2020. Takes effect on 91st day following adjournment sine die.
Title
Relating to water impoundment safety; and prescribing an effective date.
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
Roll Calls
2019-06-05 - House - House Third Reading in Concurrence (Y: 59 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-03 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-05-21 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments to the A-Eng bill. (Printed B-Eng.) (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-18 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-04-09 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-03 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-05-21 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments to the A-Eng bill. (Printed B-Eng.) (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-18 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-04-09 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-21 | House | Chapter 390, (2019 Laws): effective on the 91st day following adjournment sine die. |
2019-06-17 | House | Governor signed. |
2019-06-10 | Senate | President signed. |
2019-06-07 | House | Speaker signed. |
2019-06-05 | House | House concurred in Senate amendments and repassed bill. Ayes, 59; Nays, 1--Nathanson. |
2019-06-03 | Senate | Third reading. Carried by Bentz. Passed. Ayes, 28; Excused, 1--Taylor. |
2019-05-30 | Senate | Carried over to 06-03 by unanimous consent. |
2019-05-29 | Senate | Second reading. |
2019-05-28 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments to the A-Eng. bill. (Printed B-Eng.) |
2019-05-21 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2019-05-16 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2019-04-23 | Senate | Referred to Environment and Natural Resources. |
2019-04-22 | Senate | First reading. Referred to President's desk. |
2019-04-18 | House | Third reading. Carried by Gorsek. Passed. Ayes, 58; Excused, 2--Barreto, Marsh. |
2019-04-17 | House | Second reading. |
2019-04-16 | House | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments and be printed A-Engrossed. |
2019-04-09 | House | Work Session held. |
2019-04-04 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2019-03-05 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2019-01-18 | House | Referred to Natural Resources. |
2019-01-14 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |