OR HB2082 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Failed on June 26 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-26 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Failed on June 26 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-26 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Creates Value-Based Payments Advisory Subcommittee of Oregon Health Policy Board to develop recommendation for road map for statewide implementation of value-based payments to health care providers in state medical assistance program, health insurance exchange plans and health plans offered on commercial insurance market and to public employees. Creates Value-Based Payments Advisory Subcommittee of Oregon Health Policy Board to develop recommendation for road map for statewide implementation of value-based payments to health care providers in state medical assistance program, health insurance exchange plans and health plans offered on commercial insurance market and to public employees. Sunsets January 2, 2032.
Title
Relating to reimbursement of health care providers.
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-26 | House | In committee upon adjournment. |
2021-01-19 | House | Referred to Health Care. |
2021-01-11 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |
Oregon State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2021R1/Measures/Overview/HB2082 |
Text | https://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2021R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/HB2082/Introduced |