OR HB2081 | 2023 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Failed on June 25 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-25 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Requires Legislative Revenue Officer to study interdependence of state and local tax systems in Oregon. Requires Legislative Revenue Officer to study interdependence of state and local tax systems in Oregon. Directs officer to submit report of findings, with recommendations for legislation, to interim committees of Legislative Assembly related to revenue not later than September 15, 2024. Takes effect on 91st day following adjournment sine die.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to the interdependence of the state and local tax systems in Oregon; prescribing an effective date.

Sponsors

No sponsor information available at this time.

History

DateChamberAction
2023-06-25HouseIn committee upon adjournment.
2023-01-12HouseReferred to Revenue.
2023-01-09HouseFirst reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.

Oregon State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback