OR HB2077 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on September 25 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-09-25 - Chapter 49, (2021 Laws): Effective date September 25, 2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on September 25 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-09-25 - Chapter 49, (2021 Laws): Effective date September 25, 2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requires person to identify to Oregon Health Authority third party that performs lead-based paint activities or renovation. Requires person to identify to Oregon Health Authority third party that performs lead-based paint activities or renovation. Allows authority to order risk assessment and hazard control or abatement of lead-based paint activities and renovation when authority has reason to believe violation occurred. Allows authority to impose civil penalty for violation of order. Allows authority to impose costs related to risk assessment and hazard control or abatement and impose lien for costs. Takes effect on 91st day following adjournment sine die.
Title
Relating to lead-based paint; and prescribing an effective date.
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
Roll Calls
2021-05-12 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 16 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-04-28 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-03-15 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 42 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-03-04 - House - House Committee Do Pass (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-28 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-03-15 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 42 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-03-04 - House - House Committee Do Pass (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-09-25 | House | Chapter 49, (2021 Laws): Effective date September 25, 2021. |
2021-05-21 | House | Governor signed. |
2021-05-14 | Senate | President signed. |
2021-05-13 | House | Speaker signed. |
2021-05-12 | Senate | Vote explanation(s) filed by Heard. |
2021-05-12 | Senate | Third reading. Carried by Patterson. Passed. Ayes, 16; Nays, 12--Anderson, Boquist, Findley, Girod, Hansell, Heard, Johnson, Knopp, Linthicum, Robinson, Thatcher, Thomsen; Excused, 2--Kennemer, Manning Jr. |
2021-05-11 | Senate | Second reading. |
2021-05-11 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass. |
2021-04-28 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2021-04-21 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2021-03-24 | Senate | Referred to Health Care. |
2021-03-17 | Senate | First reading. Referred to President's desk. |
2021-03-15 | House | Third reading. Carried by Schouten. Passed. Ayes, 42; Nays, 14--Bonham, Boshart Davis, Breese-Iverson, Lewis, Morgan, Nearman, Noble, Owens, Post, Reschke, Stark, Wallan, Wright, Zika; Excused, 3--Evans, Leif, Rayfield. |
2021-03-09 | House | Second reading. |
2021-03-08 | House | Recommendation: Do pass. |
2021-03-04 | House | Work Session held. |
2021-02-02 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2021-01-19 | House | Referred to Health Care. |
2021-01-11 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |