OR HB2076 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Failed on June 26 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-26 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Failed on June 26 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-26 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Establishes Emergency Health Care Systems Program and Emergency Health Care System Advisory Board within Oregon Health Authority. Establishes Emergency Health Care Systems Program and Emergency Health Care System Advisory Board within Oregon Health Authority. Directs authority to designate emergency health care centers for provision of cardiac and pediatric emergency health care. Modifies terminology related to emergency medical services. Authorizes Governor to make available for use emergency medical services personnel and equipment. Creates offense of unlawful operation of unlicensed emergency medical services agency. Punishes by maximum of 364 days' imprisonment, $6,250 fine, or both. Becomes operative January 1, 2022. Directs authority to designate emergency health care regions within state. Becomes operative January 1, 2023. Directs authority to designate emergency health care centers for provision of stroke and trauma emergency health care. Directs program to establish emergency health care data systems for collection of information related to emergency health care in this state. Requires licensure for nontransport EMS service. Defines "nontransport EMS service." Becomes operative January 1, 2025. Takes effect on 91st day following adjournment sine die.
Title
Relating to emergency medical services; prescribing an effective date.
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-26 | House | In committee upon adjournment. |
2021-03-23 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2021-01-19 | House | Referred to Health Care with subsequent referral to Ways and Means. |
2021-01-11 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |
Oregon State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2021R1/Measures/Overview/HB2076 |
Text | https://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2021R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/HB2076/Introduced |