OR HB2074 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on September 25 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-09-25 - Chapter 512, (2021 Laws): Effective date September 25, 2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on September 25 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-09-25 - Chapter 512, (2021 Laws): Effective date September 25, 2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Increases prescription monitoring program fees from $25 to $35. Increases prescription monitoring program fees from $25 to $35. Takes effect on 91st day following adjournment sine die.
Title
Relating to prescription monitoring program fees; and prescribing an effective date.
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
Roll Calls
2021-06-22 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 20 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-06-15 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 43 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-11 - House - House Committee Do Pass (Y: 19 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-02 - House - House Committee Do pass and be referred to Ways and Means by prior reference (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-15 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 43 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-11 - House - House Committee Do Pass (Y: 19 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-02 - House - House Committee Do pass and be referred to Ways and Means by prior reference (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-09-25 | House | Chapter 512, (2021 Laws): Effective date September 25, 2021. |
2021-07-19 | House | Governor signed. |
2021-06-26 | Senate | President signed. |
2021-06-24 | House | Speaker signed. |
2021-06-22 | Senate | Third reading. Carried by Gelser. Passed. Ayes, 20; Nays, 9--Boquist, Findley, Girod, Heard, Kennemer, Linthicum, Robinson, Thatcher, Thomsen; Excused, 1--Manning Jr. |
2021-06-21 | Senate | Second reading. |
2021-06-21 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass. |
2021-06-16 | Senate | Referred to Ways and Means. |
2021-06-16 | Senate | First reading. Referred to President's desk. |
2021-06-15 | House | Third reading. Carried by Williams. Passed. Ayes, 43; Nays, 16--Bonham, Boshart Davis, Breese-Iverson, Cate, Leif, Levy, Lewis, Moore-Green, Morgan, Owens, Post, Reschke, Smith DB, Wallan, Weber, Zika. |
2021-06-14 | House | Second reading. |
2021-06-14 | House | Recommendation: Do pass. |
2021-06-11 | House | Work Session held. |
2021-06-07 | House | Returned to Full Committee. |
2021-06-07 | House | Work Session held. |
2021-06-03 | House | Assigned to Subcommittee On Human Services. |
2021-03-08 | House | Referred to Ways and Means by prior reference. |
2021-03-08 | House | Recommendation: Do pass and be referred to Ways and Means by prior reference. |
2021-03-02 | House | Work Session held. |
2021-02-18 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2021-01-19 | House | Referred to Health Care with subsequent referral to Ways and Means. |
2021-01-11 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |