OR HB2071 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on May 17 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-17 - Chapter 103, (2019 Laws): Effective date January 1, 2020.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on May 17 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-17 - Chapter 103, (2019 Laws): Effective date January 1, 2020.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Modifies eligibility for hunting tags for female mountain sheep.
Title
Relating to controlled hunt tags for female mountain sheep.
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
Roll Calls
2019-05-02 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-04-25 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-28 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 57 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-03-21 - House - House Committee Do Pass (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-04-25 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-28 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 57 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-03-21 - House - House Committee Do Pass (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-17 | House | Chapter 103, (2019 Laws): Effective date January 1, 2020. |
2019-05-13 | House | Governor signed. |
2019-05-06 | Senate | President signed. |
2019-05-06 | House | Speaker signed. |
2019-05-02 | Senate | Third reading. Carried by Prozanski. Passed. Ayes, 28; Excused, 2--Thatcher, Winters. |
2019-04-30 | Senate | Second reading. |
2019-04-30 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass. |
2019-04-25 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2019-04-18 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2019-04-02 | Senate | Referred to Environment and Natural Resources. |
2019-04-01 | Senate | First reading. Referred to President's desk. |
2019-03-28 | House | Third reading. Carried by Sprenger. Passed. Ayes, 57; Nays, 1--Sanchez; Excused, 2--Findley, Keny-Guyer. |
2019-03-27 | House | Second reading. |
2019-03-26 | House | Recommendation: Do pass. |
2019-03-21 | House | Work Session held. |
2019-03-05 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2019-01-18 | House | Referred to Natural Resources. |
2019-01-14 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |