OR HB2062 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on September 25 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-09-25 - Chapter 108, (2021 Laws): Effective date September 25, 2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on September 25 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-09-25 - Chapter 108, (2021 Laws): Effective date September 25, 2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Establishes energy efficiency standards for certain appliances sold or offered for sale in this state. Establishes energy efficiency standards for certain appliances sold or offered for sale in this state. Removes requirement that certain appliances sold or offered for sale in this state meet state energy efficiency standards. Authorizes Director of State Department of Energy to update energy efficiency standards by rule. Takes effect on 91st day following adjournment sine die.
Title
Relating to energy efficiency standards; and prescribing an effective date.
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
Roll Calls
2021-05-18 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 17 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-11 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass the A-Eng bill (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-07 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 39 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-03-10 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-11 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass the A-Eng bill (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-07 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 39 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-03-10 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-09-25 | House | Chapter 108, (2021 Laws): Effective date September 25, 2021. |
2021-06-01 | House | Governor signed. |
2021-05-25 | Senate | President signed. |
2021-05-20 | House | Speaker signed. |
2021-05-18 | Senate | Vote explanation(s) filed by Boquist, Heard. |
2021-05-18 | Senate | Third reading. Carried by Dembrow. Passed. Ayes, 17; Nays, 13--Anderson, Boquist, Findley, Girod, Hansell, Heard, Johnson, Kennemer, Knopp, Linthicum, Robinson, Thatcher, Thomsen. |
2021-05-17 | Senate | Second reading. |
2021-05-17 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass the A-Eng. bill. |
2021-05-11 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2021-04-27 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2021-04-12 | Senate | Referred to Energy and Environment. |
2021-04-08 | Senate | First reading. Referred to President's desk. |
2021-04-07 | House | Third reading. Carried by Smith DB. Passed. Ayes, 39; Nays, 19--Bonham, Boshart Davis, Breese-Iverson, Cate, Drazan, Hayden, Leif, Levy, Lewis, Morgan, Nearman, Post, Reschke, Smith DB, Stark, Wallan, Weber, Wright, Zika; Excused, 2--Clem, Smith Warner. |
2021-04-06 | House | Third Reading commenced. Carried over to April 7, 2021 Calendar by virtue of adjournment. |
2021-04-05 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to April 6, 2021 Calendar. |
2021-04-01 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to April 5, 2021 Calendar. |
2021-03-31 | House | Carried over to April 1, 2021 Calendar by virtue of adjournment. |
2021-03-30 | House | Carried over to March 31, 2021 Calendar by virtue of adjournment. |
2021-03-29 | House | Carried over to March 30, 2021 Calendar by virtue of adjournment. |
2021-03-24 | House | Carried over to March 29, 2021 Calendar by virtue of adjournment. |
2021-03-22 | House | Second reading. |
2021-03-15 | House | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments and be printed A-Engrossed. |
2021-03-10 | House | Work Session held. |
2021-03-01 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2021-01-19 | House | Referred to Energy and Environment. |
2021-01-11 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |