OR HB2060 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Engrossed on June 26 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-07-07 - At President's desk upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on June 26 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-07-07 - At President's desk upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
For purposes of taxpayer election of reduced tax rate for certain pass-through nonpassive income, requires net increase in number of employees. Provides that employees must perform required hours of employment in certain industry sectors. Applies to tax years beginning on or after January 1, 2017. Takes effect on 91st day following adjournment sine die.
Title
Relating to employment requirements for elective reduced rate of taxation on pass-through income; prescribing an effective date.
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
Roll Calls
2017-06-23 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 31 N: 28 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-06-21 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-06-21 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-07-07 | Senate | At President's desk upon adjournment. |
2017-06-26 | Senate | First reading. Referred to President's desk. |
2017-06-23 | House | Vote explanation(s) filed by Alonso Leon, Bynum, Doherty, Fahey, Gorsek, Helm, Mclain, Meek, Piluso, Power, Rayfield, Reardon, Sollman. |
2017-06-23 | House | Third reading. Carried by Barnhart. Passed.Ayes, 31; Nays, 28--Alonso Leon, Barreto, Bentz, Buehler, Esquivel, Hack, Hayden, Heard, Huffman, Johnson, Kennemer, Lewis, McKeown, McLane, Nearman, Noble, Olson, Parrish, Post, Reschke, Smith DB, Smith G, Sprenger, Stark, Vial, Whisnant, Wilson, Witt; Excused, 1--Boone. |
2017-06-22 | House | Second reading. |
2017-06-21 | House | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments and be printed A-Engrossed. |
2017-06-21 | House | Public Hearing and Work Session held. |
2017-01-17 | House | Referred to Revenue. |
2017-01-09 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |