OR HB2059 | 2017 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Failed on July 7 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-07 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

For purposes of corporate minimum tax, modifies definition of Oregon sales to exclude sales made from Oregon to state in which taxpayer is not taxable and sales of intangible property unless attributable to this state's marketplace. Applies to tax years beginning on or after January 1, 2018. Takes effect on 91st day following adjournment sine die.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to definition of "Oregon sales" as used in determining corporate minimum tax; prescribing an effective date.

Sponsors

No sponsor information available at this time.

History

DateChamberAction
2017-07-07HouseIn committee upon adjournment.
2017-01-17HouseReferred to Revenue.
2017-01-09HouseFirst reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.

Oregon State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback