OR HB2058 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on May 10 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-10 - Chapter 84, (2019 Laws): Effective date January 1, 2020.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on May 10 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-10 - Chapter 84, (2019 Laws): Effective date January 1, 2020.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Eliminates reexamination administration fee for pesticide applicators and pesticide consultants.
Title
Relating to the charging of reexamination fees to applicants for licensing in pesticide trades.
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
Roll Calls
2019-04-29 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-04-23 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-26 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 58 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-19 - House - House Committee Do Pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-23 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-26 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 58 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-19 - House - House Committee Do Pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-10 | House | Chapter 84, (2019 Laws): Effective date January 1, 2020. |
2019-05-07 | House | Governor signed. |
2019-04-30 | Senate | President signed. |
2019-04-30 | House | Speaker signed. |
2019-04-29 | Senate | Third reading. Carried by Olsen. Passed. Ayes, 28; Excused, 2--Riley, Winters. |
2019-04-25 | Senate | Second reading. |
2019-04-25 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass. |
2019-04-23 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2019-04-16 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2019-03-06 | Senate | Referred to Environment and Natural Resources. |
2019-02-28 | Senate | First reading. Referred to President's desk. |
2019-02-26 | House | Third reading. Carried by Boshart Davis. Passed. Ayes, 58; Nays, 1--Holvey; Absent, 1--Prusak. |
2019-02-25 | House | Second reading. |
2019-02-25 | House | Recommendation: Do pass. |
2019-02-19 | House | Work Session held. |
2019-01-31 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2019-01-18 | House | Referred to Agriculture and Land Use. |
2019-01-14 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |