OR HB2056 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on September 25 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-09-25 - Chapter 178, (2021 Laws): Effective date January 01, 2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on September 25 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-09-25 - Chapter 178, (2021 Laws): Effective date January 01, 2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Expands high school diploma requirements related to completion of credits in English to allow completion of credits in language arts. Expands high school diploma requirements related to completion of credits in English to allow completion of credits in language arts. Makes relevant related changes in statute to expand requirements for English to requirements for language arts. Eliminates requirement that instruction in all subjects must be conducted in English.
Title
Relating to English instruction.
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
Roll Calls
2021-05-26 - House - House Third Reading in Concurrence (Y: 43 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-05-24 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 19 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-05-10 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-09 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 45 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-03-02 - House - House Committee Do Pass (Y: 9 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-24 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 19 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-05-10 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-09 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 45 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-03-02 - House - House Committee Do Pass (Y: 9 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-09-25 | House | Chapter 178, (2021 Laws): Effective date January 01, 2022. |
2021-06-08 | House | Governor signed. |
2021-05-27 | Senate | President signed. |
2021-05-27 | House | Speaker signed. |
2021-05-26 | House | House concurred in Senate amendments and repassed bill. Ayes, 43; Nays, 15--Bonham, Boshart Davis, Breese-Iverson, Cate, Drazan, Leif, Levy, Lewis, Moore-Green, Morgan, Nearman, Post, Reschke, Wallan, Zika; Excused, 1--Evans; Excused for Business of the House, 1--Speaker Kotek. |
2021-05-24 | Senate | Vote explanation(s) filed by Heard. |
2021-05-24 | Senate | Third reading. Carried by Dembrow. Passed. Ayes, 19; Nays, 9--Findley, Girod, Hansell, Heard, Kennemer, Knopp, Linthicum, Thatcher, Thomsen; Excused, 2--Boquist, Robinson. |
2021-05-20 | Senate | Second reading. |
2021-05-18 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) |
2021-05-10 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2021-04-21 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2021-03-17 | Senate | Referred to Education. |
2021-03-10 | Senate | First reading. Referred to President's desk. |
2021-03-09 | House | Third reading. Carried by Alonso Leon. Passed. Ayes, 45; Nays, 12--Bonham, Boshart Davis, Breese-Iverson, Cate, Drazan, Levy, Lewis, Moore-Green, Nearman, Post, Reschke, Zika; Excused, 3--Clem, Hernandez, Wallan. |
2021-03-08 | House | Second reading. |
2021-03-04 | House | Recommendation: Do pass. |
2021-03-02 | House | Work Session held. |
2021-02-02 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2021-01-19 | House | Referred to Education. |
2021-01-11 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |