OR HB2056 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on August 1 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-08-01 - Chapter 576, (2019 Laws): Effective date January 1, 2020.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on August 1 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-08-01 - Chapter 576, (2019 Laws): Effective date January 1, 2020.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Establishes Housing Development Grant Program. Decouples program from Housing Development and Guarantee Account. Eliminates Housing and Community Services Department's ability to lend account funds. Expands Guarantee Fund's income eligibility to allow use by moderate income borrowers. Allows department to transfer surplus funds from Housing Development and Guarantee Account to Affordable Housing Land Acquisition Revolving Loan Program.
Title
Relating to the Housing Development and Guarantee Account.
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
Roll Calls
2019-06-29 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-06-20 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-06-14 - House - House Committee Do Pass (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-03-18 - House - House Committee Do pass and be referred to Ways and Means by prior reference (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-06-20 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-06-14 - House - House Committee Do Pass (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-03-18 - House - House Committee Do pass and be referred to Ways and Means by prior reference (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-08-01 | House | Chapter 576, (2019 Laws): Effective date January 1, 2020. |
2019-07-23 | House | Governor signed. |
2019-07-03 | Senate | President signed. |
2019-07-02 | House | Speaker signed. |
2019-06-29 | Senate | Rules suspended. Third reading. Carried by Golden. Passed. Ayes, 27; Absent, 2--Girod, Linthicum; Excused, 1--Boquist. |
2019-06-29 | Senate | Second reading. |
2019-06-29 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass. |
2019-06-29 | Senate | Referred to Ways and Means. |
2019-06-29 | Senate | First reading. Referred to President's desk. |
2019-06-20 | House | Third reading. Carried by Zika. Passed. Ayes, 58; Excused for Business of the House, 2--McKeown, Smith Warner. |
2019-06-19 | House | Second reading. |
2019-06-19 | House | Recommendation: Do pass. |
2019-06-14 | House | Work Session held. |
2019-06-05 | House | Returned to Full Committee. |
2019-06-05 | House | Work Session held. |
2019-05-30 | House | Assigned to Subcommittee On Transportation and Economic Development. |
2019-03-22 | House | Referred to Ways and Means by prior reference. |
2019-03-22 | House | Recommendation: Do pass and be referred to Ways and Means by prior reference. |
2019-03-18 | House | Work Session held. |
2019-02-04 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2019-01-15 | House | Referred to Human Services and Housing with subsequent referral to Ways and Means. |
2019-01-14 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |