OR HB2053 | 2023 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Failed on June 25 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-25 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Provides that person that carries on, conducts or transacts business in county of this state under assumed business name that person has not registered or for which person does not maintain registration lacks standing in courts of this state to maintain action on behalf of business. Provides that person that carries on, conducts or transacts business in county of this state under assumed business name that person has not registered or for which person does not maintain registration lacks standing in courts of this state to maintain action on behalf of business. Provides that court shall dismiss action without prejudice. Permits Secretary of State to investigate violations of registration requirement. Directs Secretary of State to investigate complaints that allege ascertainable loss of money or property as result of violation. Permits Secretary of State to impose civil penalty of not more than $100 for each day of violation. Specifies use to which Secretary of State shall dedicate proceeds of civil penalties. Takes effect on 91st day following adjournment sine die.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to violations of a requirement to register assumed business names; prescribing an effective date.

Sponsors

No sponsor information available at this time.

Roll Calls

2023-04-13 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 53 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2023-03-29 - House - House Committee Do Pass (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2023-06-25SenateIn committee upon adjournment.
2023-04-17SenateReferred to Labor and Business.
2023-04-13SenateFirst reading. Referred to President's desk.
2023-04-13HouseThird reading. Carried by Hudson. Passed. Ayes, 53; Excused, 6--Bynum, Goodwin, Javadi, Nathanson, Pham H, Wright; Excused for Business of the House, 1--Neron.
2023-04-12HouseRules suspended. Carried over to April 13, 2023 Calendar.
2023-04-11HouseRules suspended. Carried over to April 12, 2023 Calendar.
2023-04-10HouseRules suspended. Carried over to April 11, 2023 Calendar.
2023-04-06HouseRules suspended. Carried over to April 10, 2023 Calendar.
2023-04-05HouseSecond reading.
2023-04-05HouseRecommendation: Do pass.
2023-03-29HouseWork Session held.
2023-02-01HousePublic Hearing held.
2023-01-11HouseReferred to Business and Labor.
2023-01-09HouseFirst reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.

Oregon State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Measures/Overview/HB2053
Texthttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/HB2053/Introduced
Supplementhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/MeasureAnalysisDocument/75870
Supplementhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/MeasureAnalysisDocument/65034
Supplementhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/MeasureAnalysisDocument/75876
Supplementhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/CommitteeMeetingDocument/259811
Supplementhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/CommitteeMeetingDocument/259864
Supplementhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/CommitteeMeetingDocument/265788
Supplementhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/CommitteeMeetingDocument/265781
Supplementhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/CommitteeMeetingDocument/265782
Supplementhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/CommitteeMeetingDocument/267945
Supplementhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/CommitteeMeetingDocument/267946
Supplementhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/MeasureAnalysisDocument/77663
Supplementhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/CommitteeMeetingDocument/271442
Supplementhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/CommitteeMeetingDocument/271443
Supplementhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/CommitteeMeetingDocument/271449
Roll Callhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/CommitteeReports/MajorityReport/34890
Roll Callhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Measures/MeasureVotes?id=573090

Bill Comments

feedback