OR HB2049 | 2023 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on August 15 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-08-15 - Chapter 489, (2023 Laws): Effective date July 31, 2023.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Transfers Oregon Cybersecurity Advisory Council from office of Enterprise Information Services to Oregon Cybersecurity Center of Excellence. Transfers Oregon Cybersecurity Advisory Council from office of Enterprise Information Services to Oregon Cybersecurity Center of Excellence. Modifies composition and duties, powers and functions of council. Establishes Oregon Cybersecurity Center of Excellence within Portland State University to supplement activities of State Chief Information Officer regarding cybersecurity. Charges center with coordinating, funding or providing cybersecurity education, awareness and training for public, private and nonprofit sectors, cybersecurity workforce development and cybersecurity-related goods and services to Oregon public bodies. Directs Portland State University, Oregon State University and University of Oregon to jointly operate center by agreement and to provide administrative and staff support and facilities for center. Establishes Oregon Cybersecurity Center of Excellence Operating Fund. Continuously appropriates moneys in fund to Higher Education Coordinating Commission for distribution to center to carry out functions and operations of center. Establishes Oregon Cybersecurity Workforce Development Fund. Continuously appropriates moneys in fund to commission for distribution to center to invest in cybersecurity workforce development programs. Establishes Oregon Cybersecurity Grant Program Fund. Continuously appropriates moneys in fund to commission for distribution to center to provide cybersecurity-related goods and services to Oregon public bodies. Establishes Oregon Cybersecurity Public Awareness Fund. Continuously appropriates moneys in fund to commission for distribution to center to raise public awareness regarding cybersecurity threats and resources to be safer and more secure online.] Becomes operative October 1, 2023. Declares emergency, effective on passage.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to cybersecurity; and declaring an emergency.

Sponsors

No sponsor information available at this time.

Roll Calls

2023-06-22 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2023-06-13 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 56 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2023-06-09 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments to the A-Eng bill. (Printed B-Eng.) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-02-08 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments and be referred to Ways and Means. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2023-08-15HouseChapter 489, (2023 Laws): Effective date July 31, 2023.
2023-07-31HouseGovernor signed.
2023-06-24SenatePresident signed.
2023-06-24HouseSpeaker signed.
2023-06-22SenateVote explanation(s) filed by Anderson.
2023-06-22SenateThird reading. Carried by Woods. Passed. Ayes, 24; Absent, 6--Boquist, Hansell, Hayden, Linthicum, Robinson, Thatcher.
2023-06-21SenateCarried over to 06-22 by unanimous consent.
2023-06-20SenateSecond reading.
2023-06-20SenateRecommendation: Do pass the B-Eng. bill.
2023-06-15SenateReferred to Ways and Means.
2023-06-15SenateFirst reading. Referred to President's desk.
2023-06-13HouseRules suspended. Third reading. Carried by Nathanson. Passed. Ayes, 56; Excused, 1--Bynum; Excused for Business of the House, 3--Breese-Iverson, Conrad, Speaker Rayfield.
2023-06-13HouseSecond reading.
2023-06-12HouseRecommendation: Do pass with amendments and be printed B-Engrossed.
2023-06-09HouseWork Session held.
2023-06-06HouseReturned to Full Committee.
2023-06-06HouseWork Session held.
2023-06-01HouseAssigned to Subcommittee On Education.
2023-03-03HouseReferred to Ways and Means by order of Speaker.
2023-03-03HouseRecommendation: Do pass with amendments, be printed A-Engrossed, and be referred to Ways and Means.
2023-03-01HousePublic Hearing and Work Session held.
2023-02-22HousePublic Hearing held.
2023-02-15HouseInformational Meeting held.
2023-02-08HouseInformational Meeting held.
2023-02-01HouseInformational Meeting held.
2023-01-11HouseReferred to Information Management and Technology.
2023-01-09HouseFirst reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.

Oregon State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Measures/Overview/HB2049
Texthttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/HB2049/Introduced
Texthttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/HB2049/House%20Amendments%20to%20Introduced
Texthttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/HB2049/A-Engrossed
Texthttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/HB2049/House%20Amendments%20to%20A-Engrossed
Texthttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/HB2049/B-Engrossed
Texthttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/HB2049/Enrolled
Amendmenthttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/ProposedAmendment/22760
Amendmenthttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/ProposedAmendment/25262
Amendmenthttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/ProposedAmendment/25380
Supplementhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/MeasureAnalysisDocument/76404
Supplementhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/MeasureAnalysisDocument/75113
Supplementhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/MeasureAnalysisDocument/65030
Supplementhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/MeasureAnalysisDocument/75050
Supplementhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/MeasureAnalysisDocument/75052
Supplementhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/CommitteeMeetingDocument/259438
Supplementhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/CommitteeMeetingDocument/259983
Supplementhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/CommitteeMeetingDocument/260934
Supplementhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/CommitteeMeetingDocument/261860
Supplementhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/CommitteeMeetingDocument/262328
Supplementhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/CommitteeMeetingDocument/262598
Supplementhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/CommitteeMeetingDocument/263105
Supplementhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/CommitteeMeetingDocument/262932
Supplementhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/CommitteeMeetingDocument/262998
Supplementhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/CommitteeMeetingDocument/262934
Supplementhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/CommitteeMeetingDocument/275578
Supplementhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/CommitteeMeetingDocument/275579
Supplementhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/CommitteeMeetingDocument/275924
Supplementhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/CommitteeMeetingDocument/275925
Supplementhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/MeasureAnalysisDocument/80429
Supplementhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/MeasureAnalysisDocument/80444
Supplementhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/MeasureAnalysisDocument/80507
Supplementhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/MeasureAnalysisDocument/80703
Roll Callhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/CommitteeReports/MajorityReport/34416
Roll Callhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/CommitteeReports/MajorityReport/36047
Roll Callhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Measures/MeasureVotes?id=585458
Roll Callhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Measures/MeasureVotes?id=589039

Bill Comments

feedback