OR HB2049 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on September 25 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-09-25 - Chapter 609, (2021 Laws): Effective date January 01, 2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on September 25 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-09-25 - Chapter 609, (2021 Laws): Effective date January 01, 2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Establishes Innovative Grant Fund. Establishes Innovative Grant Fund. Directs Oregon Criminal Justice Commission to establish and administer Innovative Grant Program to award grants to programs that enhance public safety and meet other requirements. Appropriates moneys to commission for Innovative Grant Program.
Title
Relating to the Innovative Grant Program.
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
Roll Calls
2021-06-26 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 22 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-06-24 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 44 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2021-06-21 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 18 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-03-16 - House - House Committee Do pass and be referred to Ways and Means by prior reference (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-24 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 44 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2021-06-21 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 18 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-03-16 - House - House Committee Do pass and be referred to Ways and Means by prior reference (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-09-25 | House | Chapter 609, (2021 Laws): Effective date January 01, 2022. |
2021-07-27 | House | Governor signed. |
2021-06-30 | Senate | President signed. |
2021-06-29 | House | Speaker signed. |
2021-06-26 | Senate | Rules suspended. Third reading. Carried by Gorsek. Passed. Ayes, 22; Nays, 6--Boquist, Girod, Linthicum, Robinson, Thatcher, Thomsen; Excused, 2--Heard, Manning Jr. |
2021-06-26 | Senate | Second reading. |
2021-06-26 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass the A-Eng. bill. |
2021-06-25 | Senate | Referred to Ways and Means. |
2021-06-25 | Senate | First reading. Referred to President's desk. |
2021-06-24 | House | Rules suspended. Third reading. Carried by Grayber. Passed. Ayes, 44; Nays, 7--Bonham, Boshart Davis, Breese-Iverson, Cate, Reschke, Weber, Wright; Excused, 1--Smith G; Excused for Business of the House, 7--Bynum, Drazan, McLain, Nosse, Rayfield, Sanchez, Speaker Kotek. |
2021-06-24 | House | Second reading. |
2021-06-23 | House | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments and be printed A-Engrossed. |
2021-06-21 | House | Work Session held. |
2021-06-15 | House | Returned to Full Committee. |
2021-06-15 | House | Work Session held. |
2021-06-13 | House | Assigned to Subcommittee On Public Safety. |
2021-03-23 | House | Referred to Ways and Means by prior reference. |
2021-03-23 | House | Recommendation: Do pass and be referred to Ways and Means by prior reference. |
2021-03-16 | House | Work Session held. |
2021-03-11 | House | Work Session held. |
2021-03-10 | House | Returned to Full Committee. |
2021-03-01 | House | Work Session held. |
2021-02-03 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2021-01-29 | House | Assigned to Subcommittee On Civil Law. |
2021-01-19 | House | Referred to Judiciary with subsequent referral to Ways and Means. |
2021-01-11 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |