OR HB2048 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on September 25 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-09-25 - Chapter 207, (2021 Laws): Effective date January 01, 2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on September 25 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-09-25 - Chapter 207, (2021 Laws): Effective date January 01, 2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Requires court to send to Department of Corrections certified copy of order setting aside conviction. Requires court to send to Department of Corrections certified copy of order setting aside conviction.
Title
Relating to orders setting aside convictions.
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
Roll Calls
2021-05-28 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 21 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2021-05-18 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-27 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 55 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-04-08 - House - House Committee Do Pass (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-18 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-27 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 55 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-04-08 - House - House Committee Do Pass (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-09-25 | House | Chapter 207, (2021 Laws): Effective date January 01, 2022. |
2021-06-11 | House | Governor signed. |
2021-06-07 | Senate | President signed. |
2021-06-02 | House | Speaker signed. |
2021-05-28 | Senate | Vote explanation(s) filed by Heard. |
2021-05-28 | Senate | Third reading. Carried by Gelser. Passed. Ayes, 21; Nays, 1--Heard; Excused, 8--Boquist, Findley, Frederick, Hansell, Linthicum, Robinson, Thatcher, Thomsen. |
2021-05-27 | Senate | Second reading. |
2021-05-27 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass. |
2021-05-18 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2021-05-04 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2021-04-29 | Senate | Referred to Judiciary and Ballot Measure 110 Implementation. |
2021-04-28 | Senate | First reading. Referred to President's desk. |
2021-04-27 | House | Third reading. Carried by Wallan. Passed. Ayes, 55; Nays, 1--Wright; Excused, 3--Clem, Leif, Nearman; Excused for Business of the House, 1--Prusak. |
2021-04-26 | House | Second reading. |
2021-04-23 | House | Recommendation: Do pass. |
2021-04-08 | House | Work Session held. |
2021-01-28 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2021-01-19 | House | Referred to Judiciary. |
2021-01-11 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |