OR HB2047 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on September 25 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-09-25 - Chapter 206, (2021 Laws): Effective date January 01, 2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on September 25 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-09-25 - Chapter 206, (2021 Laws): Effective date January 01, 2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Modifies authority of Department of Corrections to receive, hold and dispose of property. Modifies authority of Department of Corrections to receive, hold and dispose of property. Expands authority to include property seized from person on probation or other supervised or conditional release. Provides for manner of disposing of unclaimed property.
Title
Relating to property held by the Department of Corrections.
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
Roll Calls
2021-05-28 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 21 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2021-05-18 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-27 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 53 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-04-08 - House - House Committee Do Pass (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-18 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-27 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 53 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-04-08 - House - House Committee Do Pass (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-09-25 | House | Chapter 206, (2021 Laws): Effective date January 01, 2022. |
2021-06-11 | House | Governor signed. |
2021-06-07 | Senate | President signed. |
2021-06-02 | House | Speaker signed. |
2021-05-28 | Senate | Vote explanation(s) filed by Heard. |
2021-05-28 | Senate | Third reading. Carried by Manning Jr. Passed. Ayes, 21; Nays, 1--Heard; Excused, 8--Boquist, Findley, Frederick, Hansell, Linthicum, Robinson, Thatcher, Thomsen. |
2021-05-27 | Senate | Second reading. |
2021-05-27 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass. |
2021-05-18 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2021-05-04 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2021-04-29 | Senate | Referred to Judiciary and Ballot Measure 110 Implementation. |
2021-04-28 | Senate | First reading. Referred to President's desk. |
2021-04-27 | House | Third reading. Carried by Kropf. Passed. Ayes, 53; Nays, 3--Evans, Reschke, Wright; Excused, 3--Clem, Leif, Nearman; Excused for Business of the House, 1--Prusak. |
2021-04-26 | House | Second reading. |
2021-04-20 | House | Recommendation: Do pass. |
2021-04-08 | House | Work Session held. |
2021-01-28 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2021-01-19 | House | Referred to Judiciary. |
2021-01-11 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |