OR HB2045 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on August 4 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-08-04 - Chapter 393, (2023 Laws): Effective date January 1, 2024.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on August 4 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-08-04 - Chapter 393, (2023 Laws): Effective date January 1, 2024.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Requires health care providers to annually report to Oregon Health Authority providers' aggregate amount of compensation paid to frontline workers as wages, benefits, salaries, bonuses and incentive payments. Requires Oregon Health Authority to study access to health care in Oregon. Directs authority to submit findings to interim committees of Legislative Assembly related to health not later than September 15, 2024.] Requires health care providers to annually report to Oregon Health Authority providers' aggregate amount of compensation paid to frontline workers as wages, benefits, salaries, bonuses and incentive payments. Excludes increases in aggregate amount of compensation in determining whether health care provider meets cost growth target set by Health Care Cost Growth Target program.
Title
Relating to health care.
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
Roll Calls
2023-06-24 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 24 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2023-06-16 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass the A-Eng bill (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-05-11 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 54 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2023-05-04 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-04-04 - House - House Committee Without recommendation as to passage and be referred to Rules (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-06-16 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass the A-Eng bill (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-05-11 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 54 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2023-05-04 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-04-04 - House - House Committee Without recommendation as to passage and be referred to Rules (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-08-04 | House | Chapter 393, (2023 Laws): Effective date January 1, 2024. |
2023-07-27 | House | Governor signed. |
2023-06-27 | Senate | President signed. |
2023-06-25 | House | Speaker signed. |
2023-06-24 | Senate | Vote explanation(s) filed by Knopp. |
2023-06-24 | Senate | Third reading. Carried by Lieber. Passed. Ayes, 24; Nays, 1--Robinson; Absent, 5--Boquist, Hansell, Hayden, Linthicum, Thatcher. |
2023-06-23 | Senate | Carried over to 06-24 by unanimous consent. |
2023-06-22 | Senate | Carried over to 06-23 by unanimous consent. |
2023-06-21 | Senate | Second reading. |
2023-06-21 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass the A-Eng. bill. |
2023-06-16 | Senate | Public Hearing and Work Session held. |
2023-06-16 | Senate | Referred to Rules. |
2023-06-15 | Senate | First reading. Referred to President's desk. |
2023-05-11 | House | Third reading. Carried by Nosse. Passed. Ayes, 54; Excused, 3--Bynum, Diehl, Owens; Excused for Business of the House, 3--Fahey, McIntire, Speaker Rayfield. |
2023-05-09 | House | Second reading. |
2023-05-08 | House | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments and be printed A-Engrossed. |
2023-05-04 | House | Work Session held. |
2023-04-27 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2023-04-10 | House | Referred to Rules by order of Speaker. |
2023-04-10 | House | Without recommendation as to passage and be referred to Rules. |
2023-04-04 | House | Work Session held. |
2023-04-03 | House | Work Session held. |
2023-01-11 | House | Referred to Behavioral Health and Health Care. |
2023-01-09 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |