OR HB2044 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Introduced on January 11 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-04-09 - Gomberg served notice of possible reconsideration.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Allows Department of Consumer and Business Services to access data in All Payer All Claims database by certifying data will only be used to carry out department's duties. Allows Department of Consumer and Business Services to access data in All Payer All Claims database by certifying data will only be used to carry out department's duties. Protects from disclosure personally identifiable information about consumers who report to department price increases for prescriptions drugs. Requires pharmaceutical manufacturers to report to department information about patient assistance programs offered to consumers for certain new prescription drugs introduced for sale in United States. Requires all insurers offering health benefit plans to annually report to department data about prescription drugs covered by plans.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to information reported to the Department of Consumer and Business Services.

Sponsors

No sponsor information available at this time.

Roll Calls

2021-04-09 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 28 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2021-03-25 - House - House Committee Do Pass (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-04-09HouseGomberg served notice of possible reconsideration.
2021-04-09HouseCarried by Salinas. Failed. Ayes, 28; Nays, 20--Boshart Davis, Breese-Iverson, Cate, Drazan, Evans, Gomberg, Lewis, Lively, Meek, Moore-Green, Morgan, Noble, Owens, Post, Reschke, Smith DB, Stark, Weber, Witt, Wright; Excused, 12--Alonso Leon, Bonham, Clem, Dexter, Hayden, Leif, Levy, Nearman, Ruiz, Smith G, Wallan, Zika.
2021-04-09HouseThird reading.
2021-04-08HouseCarried over to April 9, 2021 Calendar by virtue of adjournment.
2021-04-07HouseRules suspended. Carried over to April 8, 2021 Calendar.
2021-04-06HouseCarried over to April 7, 2021 Calendar by virtue of adjournment.
2021-04-05HouseRules suspended. Carried over to April 6, 2021 Calendar.
2021-04-01HouseRules suspended. Carried over to April 5, 2021 Calendar.
2021-03-31HouseCarried over to April 1, 2021 Calendar by virtue of adjournment.
2021-03-30HouseSecond reading.
2021-03-26HouseRecommendation: Do pass.
2021-03-25HouseWork Session held.
2021-03-18HouseWork Session held.
2021-03-09HousePublic Hearing held.
2021-03-02HousePublic Hearing held.
2021-01-19HouseReferred to Health Care.
2021-01-11HouseFirst reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.

Oregon State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback