OR HB2040 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on May 24 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-24 - Chapter 123, (2019 Laws): Effective date January 1, 2020.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on May 24 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-24 - Chapter 123, (2019 Laws): Effective date January 1, 2020.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Adds four members to Traditional Health Workers Commission. Adds two] four members to Traditional Health Workers Commission.
Title
Relating to the Traditional Health Workers Commission.
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
Roll Calls
2019-05-08 - House - House Third Reading in Concurrence (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-06 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2019-04-22 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments to the A-Eng bill. (Printed B-Eng.) (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-20 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 57 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-02-12 - House - House Committee Do Pass the bill (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-06 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2019-04-22 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments to the A-Eng bill. (Printed B-Eng.) (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-20 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 57 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-02-12 - House - House Committee Do Pass the bill (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-24 | House | Chapter 123, (2019 Laws): Effective date January 1, 2020. |
2019-05-20 | House | Governor signed. |
2019-05-13 | Senate | President signed. |
2019-05-09 | House | Speaker signed. |
2019-05-08 | House | House concurred in Senate amendments and repassed bill. Ayes, 60. |
2019-05-06 | Senate | Third reading. Carried by Linthicum. Passed. Ayes, 20; Absent, 8--Bentz, Boquist, Girod, Hansell, Heard, Linthicum, Olsen, Thatcher; Excused, 2--Thomsen, Winters. |
2019-05-02 | Senate | Second reading. |
2019-05-01 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments to the A-Eng. bill. (Printed B-Eng.) |
2019-04-22 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2019-04-15 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2019-02-22 | Senate | Referred to Health Care. |
2019-02-21 | Senate | First reading. Referred to President's desk. |
2019-02-20 | House | Third reading. Carried by Mitchell. Passed. Ayes, 57; Excused for Business of the House, 3--Hernandez, Smith G, Speaker Kotek. |
2019-02-19 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to February 20, 2019 Calendar. |
2019-02-18 | House | Second reading. |
2019-02-14 | House | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments and be printed A-Engrossed. |
2019-02-12 | House | Work Session held. |
2019-01-24 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2019-01-15 | House | Referred to Health Care. |
2019-01-14 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |