OR HB2038 | 2023 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on August 4 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-08-04 - Chapter 392, (2023 Laws): Effective date January 1, 2024.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Requires statement of economic interest to include certain information about sources of income for business in which public official or candidate, or member of household of public official or candidate, is officer, holds directorship or does business under if source of income has legislative or administrative interest and 10 percent or more of total gross annual income of business comes from that source of income. Requires statement of economic interest to include certain information about sources of income for business in which public official or candidate, or member of household of public official or candidate, is officer, holds directorship or does business under if source of income has legislative or administrative interest and 10 percent or more of total gross annual income of business comes from that source of income.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to statements of economic interest.

Sponsors

No sponsor information available at this time.

Roll Calls

2023-06-22 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 22 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2023-06-13 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 51 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2023-06-09 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments to the A-Eng bill. (Printed B-Eng.) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-05-23 - House - House Committee (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2023-08-04HouseChapter 392, (2023 Laws): Effective date January 1, 2024.
2023-07-27HouseGovernor signed.
2023-06-24SenatePresident signed.
2023-06-24HouseSpeaker signed.
2023-06-22SenateVote explanation(s) filed by Anderson.
2023-06-22SenateThird reading. Carried by Patterson. Passed. Ayes, 22; Nays, 2--Findley, Girod; Absent, 6--Boquist, Hansell, Hayden, Linthicum, Robinson, Thatcher.
2023-06-21SenateCarried over to 06-22 by unanimous consent.
2023-06-20SenateSecond reading.
2023-06-20SenateRecommendation: Do pass the B-Eng. bill.
2023-06-15SenateReferred to Ways and Means.
2023-06-15SenateFirst reading. Referred to President's desk.
2023-06-13HouseRules suspended. Third reading. Carried by Fahey. Passed. Ayes, 51; Nays, 5--Cate, Cramer, Hieb, McIntire, Owens; Excused, 1--Bynum; Excused for Business of the House, 3--Breese-Iverson, Conrad, Speaker Rayfield.
2023-06-13HouseSecond reading.
2023-06-12HouseRecommendation: Do pass with amendments and be printed B-Engrossed.
2023-06-09HouseWork Session held.
2023-06-06HouseReturned to Full Committee.
2023-06-06HouseWork Session held.
2023-05-31HouseAssigned to Subcommittee On General Government.
2023-05-25HouseReferred to Ways and Means by order of Speaker.
2023-05-25HouseRecommendation: Do pass with amendments, be printed A-Engrossed, and be referred to Ways and Means.
2023-05-23HouseWork Session held.
2023-05-16HousePublic Hearing held.
2023-01-11HouseReferred to Rules.
2023-01-09HouseFirst reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.

Oregon State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Measures/Overview/HB2038
Texthttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/HB2038/Introduced
Texthttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/HB2038/House%20Amendments%20to%20Introduced
Texthttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/HB2038/A-Engrossed
Texthttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/HB2038/House%20Amendments%20to%20A-Engrossed
Texthttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/HB2038/B-Engrossed
Texthttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/HB2038/Enrolled
Amendmenthttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/ProposedAmendment/24941
Amendmenthttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/ProposedAmendment/25076
Amendmenthttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/ProposedAmendment/25280
Amendmenthttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/ProposedAmendment/25355
Supplementhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/MeasureAnalysisDocument/65019
Supplementhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/CommitteeMeetingDocument/273798
Supplementhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/CommitteeMeetingDocument/274079
Supplementhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/CommitteeMeetingDocument/274385
Supplementhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/CommitteeMeetingDocument/274503
Supplementhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/MeasureAnalysisDocument/79968
Supplementhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/MeasureAnalysisDocument/79971
Supplementhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/MeasureAnalysisDocument/79996
Supplementhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/MeasureAnalysisDocument/80028
Supplementhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/CommitteeMeetingDocument/275600
Supplementhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/CommitteeMeetingDocument/275849
Supplementhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/CommitteeMeetingDocument/275866
Supplementhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/MeasureAnalysisDocument/80386
Supplementhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/MeasureAnalysisDocument/80428
Supplementhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/MeasureAnalysisDocument/80506
Supplementhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/MeasureAnalysisDocument/80702
Supplementhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/MeasureAnalysisDocument/80935
Roll Callhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/CommitteeReports/MajorityReport/35922
Roll Callhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/CommitteeReports/MajorityReport/36046
Roll Callhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Measures/MeasureVotes?id=585450
Roll Callhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Measures/MeasureVotes?id=589009

Bill Comments

feedback