OR HB2037 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on May 17 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-17 - Chapter 98, (2019 Laws): Effective date January 1, 2020.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on May 17 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-17 - Chapter 98, (2019 Laws): Effective date January 1, 2020.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Allows Public Employees' Benefit Board and Oregon Educators Benefit Board to make available long term care insurance plans at boards' discretion rather than as statutory requirement.
Title
Relating to state benefit boards' provision of long term care insurance plans.
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
Roll Calls
2019-04-30 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-04-22 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-18 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 54 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-03-07 - House - House Committee Do Pass (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-22 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-18 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 54 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-03-07 - House - House Committee Do Pass (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-17 | House | Chapter 98, (2019 Laws): Effective date January 1, 2020. |
2019-05-13 | House | Governor signed. |
2019-05-03 | Senate | President signed. |
2019-05-01 | House | Speaker signed. |
2019-04-30 | Senate | Third reading. Carried by Knopp. Passed. Ayes, 28; Excused, 2--Girod, Winters. |
2019-04-29 | Senate | Second reading. |
2019-04-29 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass. |
2019-04-22 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2019-04-10 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2019-03-21 | Senate | Referred to Health Care. |
2019-03-19 | Senate | First reading. Referred to President's desk. |
2019-03-18 | House | Third reading. Carried by Greenlick. Passed. Ayes, 54; Excused, 6--Boles, Findley, Marsh, McLane, Smith DB, Sprenger. |
2019-03-14 | House | Second reading. |
2019-03-13 | House | Recommendation: Do pass. |
2019-03-07 | House | Work Session held. |
2019-02-26 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2019-01-15 | House | Referred to Health Care. |
2019-01-14 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |