OR HB2036 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on September 25 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-09-25 - Chapter 203, (2021 Laws): Effective date January 01, 2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on September 25 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-09-25 - Chapter 203, (2021 Laws): Effective date January 01, 2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizes State Board of Parole and Post-Prison Supervision to discharge person from parole or post-prison supervision prior to end of supervision term for specified medical reason if compatible with best interests of person and community. Authorizes State Board of Parole and Post-Prison Supervision to discharge person from parole or post-prison supervision prior to end of supervision term for specified medical reason if compatible with best interests of person and community. Requires board to make reasonable effort to notify victim prior to final decision concerning discharge.
Title
Relating to supervision by the State Board of Parole and Post-Prison Supervision.
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
Roll Calls
2021-05-27 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 19 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-05-18 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass the A-Eng bill (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-15 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 54 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-04-01 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-18 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass the A-Eng bill (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-15 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 54 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-04-01 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-09-25 | House | Chapter 203, (2021 Laws): Effective date January 01, 2022. |
2021-06-11 | House | Governor signed. |
2021-06-07 | Senate | President signed. |
2021-06-02 | House | Speaker signed. |
2021-05-27 | Senate | Vote explanation(s) filed by Heard. |
2021-05-27 | Senate | Gelser, excused, granted unanimous consent to vote aye. |
2021-05-27 | Senate | Third reading. Carried by Dembrow. Passed. Ayes, 19; Nays, 8--Boquist, Girod, Hansell, Heard, Knopp, Linthicum, Robinson, Thomsen; Excused, 3--Findley, Frederick, Thatcher. |
2021-05-26 | Senate | Second reading. |
2021-05-26 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass the A-Eng. bill. |
2021-05-18 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2021-04-29 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2021-04-23 | Senate | Referred to Judiciary and Ballot Measure 110 Implementation. |
2021-04-19 | Senate | First reading. Referred to President's desk. |
2021-04-15 | House | Third reading. Carried by Dexter. Passed. Ayes, 54; Nays, 2--Drazan, Evans; Excused, 3--Breese-Iverson, Levy, Wallan; Excused for Business of the House, 1--Prusak. |
2021-04-14 | House | Carried over to April 15, 2021 Calendar by virtue of adjournment. |
2021-04-13 | House | Carried over to April 14, 2021 Calendar by virtue of adjournment. |
2021-04-12 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to April 13, 2021 Calendar. |
2021-04-10 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to April 12, 2021 Calendar. |
2021-04-09 | House | Second reading. |
2021-04-07 | House | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments and be printed A-Engrossed. |
2021-04-01 | House | Work Session held. |
2021-01-28 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2021-01-19 | House | Referred to Judiciary. |
2021-01-11 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |