OR HB2034 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on May 27 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-27 - Chapter 140, (2011 Laws): Effective date May 27, 2011.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on May 27 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-27 - Chapter 140, (2011 Laws): Effective date May 27, 2011.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to worker training; and declaring an emergency.
Title
Relating to worker training; and declaring an emergency.
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-05-27 | Chapter 140, (2011 Laws): Effective date May 27, 2011. | |
2011-05-27 | Governor signed. | |
2011-05-20 | President signed. | |
2011-05-19 | Co-Speakers signed. | |
2011-05-12 | Third reading. Carried by Morse. Passed. Ayes, 30. | |
2011-05-11 | Second reading. | |
2011-05-11 | Recommendation: Do pass. | |
2011-05-10 | Public Hearing and Work Session held. | |
2011-03-07 | Referred to Education and Workforce Development. | |
2011-03-01 | First reading. Referred to President's desk. | |
2011-02-28 | Third reading. Carried by Doherty. Passed. Ayes, 58; Nays, 1--Hicks; Excused, 1--Frederick. | |
2011-02-23 | Second reading. | |
2011-02-22 | Recommendation: Do pass. | |
2011-02-16 | Public Hearing and Work Session held. | |
2011-01-21 | Referred to Business and Labor. | |
2011-01-10 | First reading. Referred to the desks of the Co-Speakers. |