OR HB2031 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 13 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-13 - Chapter 494, (2017 Laws): Effective date June 29, 2017.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 13 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-13 - Chapter 494, (2017 Laws): Effective date June 29, 2017.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Permits owner of Metolius resort site to apply to county for approval of small-scale recreation community within three years if owner meets certain requirements. Modifies areas on which small-scale recreation community may not be sited. Directs county court to enforce requirements of weed control district. Declares emergency, effective on passage.
Title
Relating to use of land; and declaring an emergency.
Sponsors
Rep. Brian Clem [D] |
Roll Calls
2017-06-15 - House - House Third Reading in Concurrence (Y: 54 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-06-08 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-31 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments to the A-Eng bill. (Printed B-Eng.) (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-26 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 52 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2017-04-18 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-06-08 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-31 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments to the A-Eng bill. (Printed B-Eng.) (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-26 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 52 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2017-04-18 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-07-13 | House | Chapter 494, (2017 Laws): Effective date June 29, 2017. |
2017-06-29 | House | Governor signed. |
2017-06-23 | Senate | President signed. |
2017-06-20 | House | Speaker signed. |
2017-06-15 | House | House concurred in Senate amendments and repassed bill.Ayes, 54; Nays, 3--Holvey, Nathanson, Rayfield; Excused, 2--Bentz, Boone; Excused for Business of the House, 1--Kennemer. |
2017-06-08 | Senate | Third reading. Carried by Olsen. Passed.Ayes, 30. |
2017-06-07 | Senate | Second reading. |
2017-06-06 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments to the A-Eng. bill. (Printed B-Eng.) |
2017-05-31 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2017-05-24 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2017-05-15 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2017-05-01 | Senate | Referred to Environment and Natural Resources. |
2017-04-27 | Senate | First reading. Referred to President's desk. |
2017-04-26 | House | Third reading. Carried by Clem. Passed.Ayes, 52; Nays, 4--Barnhart, Holvey, Nathanson, Rayfield; Excused, 1--McKeown; Excused for Business of the House, 3--Lininger, McLane, Sollman. |
2017-04-25 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to April 26, 2017 Calendar. |
2017-04-24 | House | Second reading. |
2017-04-21 | House | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments and be printed A-Engrossed. |
2017-04-18 | House | Work Session held. |
2017-04-13 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2017-01-17 | House | Referred to Agriculture and Natural Resources. |
2017-01-09 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |